Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4517 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/28/2019

                    86R19165 GRM-F
 By: Parker H.B. No. 4517
 Substitute the following for H.B. No. 4517:
 By:  Capriglione C.S.H.B. No. 4517


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of a work group on blockchain matters
 concerning this state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a) In this section:
 (1)  "Blockchain" includes digital assets, virtual
 currency, and the integration of smart contracts.
 (2)  "Work group" means the work group on blockchain
 matters established under this section.
 (b)  The work group on blockchain matters is composed of the
 following 14 members:
 (1)  one member of the house of representatives
 appointed by the speaker of the house of representatives;
 (2)  one member of the senate appointed by the
 lieutenant governor;
 (3)  two members representing institutions of higher
 education appointed by the governor; and
 (4)  10 members of the public, five of whom are
 appointed by the speaker of the house of representatives and five of
 whom are appointed by the lieutenant governor, who:
 (A)  have knowledge and experience in blockchain
 technology; or
 (B)  represent an industry that would benefit from
 the use of blockchain technology.
 (c)  The governor shall designate a member of the work group
 appointed under Subsection (b)(3) of this section to serve as chair
 of the work group. The members of the work group appointed under
 Subsections (b)(1) and (2) of this section shall serve as co-vice
 chairs of the work group.
 (d)  A member of the work group may not receive compensation
 for serving on the work group or reimbursement for expenses
 incurred by the member in the performance of official duties as a
 member of the work group.
 (e)  The work group shall meet at the call of the chair.
 (f)  The work group shall develop a master plan for the
 expansion of the blockchain industry in this state and recommend
 policies and state investments in connection with blockchain
 technology. In developing the master plan, the work group shall:
 (1)  identify economic growth and development
 opportunities presented by blockchain technology;
 (2)  assess the existing blockchain industry in this
 state;
 (3)  review workforce needs and academic programs
 required to build blockchain expertise across all relevant
 industries; and
 (4)  make any legislative recommendations that will
 help promote innovation and economic growth by reducing barriers to
 and expediting the expansion of the state's blockchain industry
 based on its findings under Subdivisions (1)-(3) of this
 subsection.
 (g)  Not later than November 1, 2020, the work group shall
 submit a report that includes the master plan developed under
 Subsection (f) of this section to each standing committee of the
 senate and house of representatives with primary jurisdiction over
 economic development or technology issues.
 (h)  The work group may adopt rules, procedures, and policies
 as necessary to administer this section and implement the
 responsibilities of the work group.
 (i)  This section expires and the work group is abolished
 June 30, 2021.
 SECTION 2.  As soon as practicable, but not later than
 October 1, 2019, the governor, lieutenant governor, and the speaker
 of the house of representatives shall appoint the members of the
 work group on blockchain matters established by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  Not later than November 1, 2019, the work group
 on blockchain matters shall hold its initial meeting.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.