Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB463 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/17/2019

                    By: Springer (Senate Sponsor - Perry, et al.) H.B. No. 463
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2019;
 April 15, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
 Human Services; May 17, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 17, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 463 By:  Perry


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to reciprocity agreements between certain air ambulance
 companies operating a subscription program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 773.011, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by amending Subsections (b) and (e) and adding Subsection
 (d-1) to read as follows:
 (b)  The executive commissioner shall adopt rules
 establishing minimum standards for the creation and operation of a
 subscription program. The rules must:
 (1)  ensure the protection of public health and safety;
 (2)  ensure compliance with federal laws and rules
 related to air ambulance subscription program services; and
 (3)  establish minimum standards and objectives for the
 delivery of air ambulance emergency medical services provided in
 accordance with a reciprocity agreement entered into under
 Subsection (d-1).
 (d-1)  To ensure maximum geographic coverage for patients
 covered under a subscription program, an air ambulance company that
 operates a subscription program shall, in accordance with executive
 commissioner rules, enter into a reciprocity agreement with each
 other air ambulance company that operates a subscription program in
 the same service delivery area.
 (e)  The Insurance Code does not apply to a subscription
 program established or a reciprocity agreement entered into under
 this section.
 SECTION 2.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the executive commissioner of the Health and Human
 Services Commission shall adopt rules necessary to implement
 Section 773.011, Health and Safety Code, as amended by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2020.
 * * * * *