Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4716 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/20/2019

                    By: Button (Senate Sponsor - Johnson) H.B. No. 4716
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2019;
 May 10, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 19, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 19, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the municipal court of record of the City of Rowlett.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter HH, Chapter 30, Government Code, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *