Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB489 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/14/2019

                    By: Springer (Senate Sponsor - Seliger) H.B. No. 489
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 26, 2019;
 April 29, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Water &
 Rural Affairs; May 14, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0;
 May 14, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 489 By:  Perry


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use of certain weapons in or on the beds or banks of
 certain rivers and streams in particular counties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 284.001(b), Parks and Wildlife Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  This section applies only to a navigable river or stream
 located wholly or partly in Dimmit, Edwards, Frio, Hall, Kenedy,
 Llano, Maverick, Real, Uvalde, or Zavala County.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 350, Parks and Wildlife Code, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *