Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB5 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/15/2019

                    By: Phelan, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Kolkhorst) H.B. No. 5
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2019;
 April 16, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Water &
 Rural Affairs; May 15, 2019, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 15, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to debris management and other disaster recovery efforts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 418, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Sections 418.054, 418.055, 418.056, and 418.057
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 418.054.  CATASTROPHIC DEBRIS MANAGEMENT PLAN AND
 TRAINING. (a)  The division, in consultation with any other state
 agencies selected by the division, shall develop a catastrophic
 debris management plan and model guide for use by political
 subdivisions in the event of a disaster.
 (b)  The plan must:
 (1)   provide a guide for clearance and disposal of
 debris caused by a disaster, including information on preparing for
 debris removal before a disaster; and
 (2)  include:
 (A)  provisions for the use of trench burners and
 air curtain incinerators of vegetative debris, including
 identifying sources of equipment for use immediately following a
 disaster; and
 (B)  procedures for:
 (i)  vegetative debris burning, including
 the role of the Texas Department of Transportation in debris
 removal;
 (ii)  the coordination of clearance and
 disposal of debris;
 (iii)  obtaining equipment necessary for use
 immediately following a disaster; and
 (iv)  the interaction between political
 subdivisions and state and federal agencies.
 (c)  The Texas A&M Engineering Extension Service shall
 establish a training program for state agencies and political
 subdivisions on the use of trench burners in debris removal.
 Sec. 418.055.  CONTRACTING FOR DEBRIS REMOVAL. (a)  The
 division, in consultation with the Federal Emergency Management
 Agency, shall develop and publish a model contract for debris
 removal services to be used by political subdivisions following a
 disaster.
 (b)  The division shall consult with the comptroller to:
 (1)  establish appropriate contracting standards and
 contractor requirements to include in the model contract; and
 (2)  include a contract for debris removal services on
 the schedule of multiple award contracts developed under Subchapter
 I, Chapter 2155, or in another cooperative purchasing program
 administered by the comptroller.
 Sec. 418.056.  WET DEBRIS STUDY GROUP. (a)  In this section,
 "study group" means the wet debris study group established under
 this section.
 (b)  The wet debris study group is established and composed
 of representatives of the division, any other state agencies
 selected by the division, and local and federal governmental
 entities.
 (c)  The chief of the division serves as chair of the study
 group.
 (d)  The study group shall study issues related to removal of
 wet debris, including best practices for clearing wet debris
 following a disaster and determining responsibility for that
 removal.
 (e)  Not later than November 1, 2020, the study group shall
 submit a report containing recommendations on the issues described
 by Subsection (d) to each member of the legislature.
 (f)  The study group is abolished and this section expires
 January 1, 2021.
 Sec. 418.057.  WORK GROUP ON LOCAL RESTRICTIONS THAT IMPEDE
 DISASTER RECOVERY EFFORTS.  (a) In this section, "work group" means
 the work group established under this section.
 (b)  The work group is established and composed of
 representatives of the division, any other state agencies selected
 by the division, and local governmental entities.
 (c)  The chief of the division serves as chair of the work
 group.
 (d)  The work group shall conduct a study on local
 restrictions that impede disaster recovery efforts, including
 efforts to remove debris and erect short-term housing.
 (e)  The study conducted under Subsection (d) must include:
 (1)  an overview of official actions by governing
 bodies of political subdivisions and requirements imposed by deed
 restrictions or property owners' associations that impede state and
 federal disaster recovery efforts in this state; and
 (2)  recommendations for minimizing the effect of the
 official actions and requirements described by Subdivision (1) on
 state and federal disaster recovery efforts in this state.
 (f)  Not later than November 1, 2020, the work group shall
 submit a written report to the members of the legislature with the
 results of the study required under this section.
 (g)  This section expires and the work group is abolished
 January 1, 2021.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than January 1, 2020, the Texas
 Division of Emergency Management shall develop the catastrophic
 debris management plan and model guide required by Section 418.054,
 Government Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *