Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB511 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/09/2019

                    By: Wilson, Bucy (Senate Sponsor - Schwertner) H.B. No. 511
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2019;
 April 29, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 9, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0;
 May 9, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 511 By:  Hinojosa


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the enforcement of commercial motor vehicle safety
 standards in certain counties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 644.101(c), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (c)  A sheriff or a deputy sheriff of any of the following
 counties [a county bordering the United Mexican States or of a
 county with a population of 700,000 or more] is eligible to apply
 for certification under this section:
 (1)  a county bordering the United Mexican States;
 (2)  a county with a population of 700,000 or more; or
 (3)  a county with a population of 400,000 or more that
 borders the county in which the State Capitol is located.
 SECTION 2.  Section 644.102, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (h) to read as follows:
 (h)  The department may revoke or rescind the authority of a
 municipality or county to engage in enforcement under this chapter
 if the municipality or county fails to comply with this section or
 any standard established under Subsection (a).
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *