Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB531 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/16/2019

                    By: Miller (Senate Sponsor - Buckingham) H.B. No. 531
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2019;
 April 29, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
 Human Services; May 16, 2019, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 16, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the retention by hospitals and physicians of certain
 medical records of a sexual assault victim.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter E, Chapter 241, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 241.1031 to read as follows:
 Sec. 241.1031.  PRESERVATION OF RECORD FROM FORENSIC MEDICAL
 EXAMINATION. (a)  A hospital may not destroy a medical record from
 the forensic medical examination of a sexual assault victim
 conducted under Article 56.06 or 56.065, Code of Criminal
 Procedure, until the 20th anniversary of the date the record was
 created.
 (b)  A hospital may maintain a medical record described by
 Subsection (a) in the same form in which the hospital maintains
 other medical records.
 SECTION 2.  Section 153.003, Occupations Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 153.003.  RULES REGARDING MAINTENANCE OF PATIENT
 RECORDS. (a) The board by rule shall establish the period for
 which patient records must be maintained.
 (b)  The rules adopted under this section must prohibit a
 physician from destroying a medical record from the forensic
 medical examination of a sexual assault victim conducted under
 Article 56.06 or 56.065, Code of Criminal Procedure, until the 20th
 anniversary of the date the record was created.
 SECTION 3.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a medical record created on or after March 1, 2020. A medical
 record created before March 1, 2020, is governed by the law in
 effect on the date the record was created, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *