Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB541 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/14/2019

                    By: González of El Paso, Walle, Toth H.B. No. 541
 (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 15, 2019;
 April 17, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 14, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 14, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the right to express breast milk.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 165.002, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 165.002.  RIGHT TO BREAST-FEED OR EXPRESS BREAST MILK.
 A mother is entitled to breast-feed her baby or express breast milk
 in any location in which the mother's presence [mother] is
 otherwise authorized [to be].
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *