Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB587 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/13/2019

                    By: Stephenson, Middleton, Kacal H.B. No. 587
 (Senate Sponsor - Kolkhorst)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2019;
 April 30, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 13, 2019, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 13, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of a portion of State Highway 71 in
 Wharton County as the Game Warden Justin Hurst Memorial Highway.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 225.1451 to read as follows:
 Sec. 225.1451.  GAME WARDEN JUSTIN HURST MEMORIAL HIGHWAY.
 (a)  The portion of State Highway 71 in Wharton County between its
 intersection with Farm-to-Market Road 2765 and the Matagorda County
 line is designated as the Game Warden Justin Hurst Memorial
 Highway.
 (b)  Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall:
 (1)  design and construct markers indicating the
 designation as the Game Warden Justin Hurst Memorial Highway and
 any other appropriate information; and
 (2)  erect a marker at each end of the highway and at
 appropriate intermediate sites along the highway.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *