Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB6 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/15/2019

                    By: Morrison, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Kolkhorst) H.B. No. 6
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2019;
 April 16, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Water &
 Rural Affairs; May 15, 2019, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 15, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to developing a disaster recovery task force to assist
 with long-term disaster recovery.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 418, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 418.054 to read as follows:
 Sec. 418.054.  DISASTER RECOVERY TASK FORCE. (a) The
 division shall develop a disaster recovery task force to operate
 throughout the long-term recovery period following natural and
 man-made disasters by providing specialized assistance for
 communities and individuals to address financial issues, available
 federal assistance programs, and recovery and resiliency planning
 to speed recovery efforts at the local level.
 (b)  The disaster recovery task force may include and use the
 resources of:
 (1)  any appropriate state agencies, including
 institutions of higher education; and
 (2)  organized volunteer groups.
 (c)  The disaster recovery task force shall develop
 procedures for preparing and issuing a report listing each project
 related to a disaster that qualifies for federal assistance. A
 report must be submitted to the appropriate federal agencies as
 soon as practicable after any disaster.
 (d)  Once each quarter, the disaster recovery task force
 shall brief members of the legislature, legislative staff, and
 state agency personnel on the response and recovery efforts for
 previous disasters and any preparation or planning for potential
 future hazards, threats, or disasters.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *