Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB639 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/13/2019

                    By: Springer (Senate Sponsor - Nichols) H.B. No. 639
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2019;
 May 6, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Property
 Tax; May 13, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas
 5, Nays 0; May 13, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the eligibility of land used as an ecological
 laboratory for appraisal for ad valorem tax purposes as qualified
 open-space land.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 23.51(1), Tax Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 (1)  "Qualified open-space land" means land that is
 currently devoted principally to agricultural use to the degree of
 intensity generally accepted in the area and that has been devoted
 principally to agricultural use or to production of timber or
 forest products for five of the preceding seven years or land that
 is used principally as an ecological laboratory by a public or
 private college or university and that has been used principally in
 that manner by a college or university for five of the preceding
 seven years.  Qualified open-space land includes all appurtenances
 to the land.  For the purposes of this subdivision, appurtenances to
 the land means private roads, dams, reservoirs, water wells,
 canals, ditches, terraces, and other reshapings of the soil,
 fences, and riparian water rights. Notwithstanding the other
 provisions of this subdivision, land that is currently devoted
 principally to wildlife management as defined by Subdivision (7)(B)
 or (C) to the degree of intensity generally accepted in the area
 qualifies for appraisal as qualified open-space land under this
 subchapter regardless of the manner in which the land was used in
 any preceding year.
 SECTION 2.  (a) Except as provided by Subsection (b) of this
 section, the change in law made by this Act applies beginning with
 the tax year that begins January 1, 2021.
 (b)  This subsection applies only to land that first
 qualified for appraisal under Subchapter D, Chapter 23, Tax Code,
 on the basis of its use as an ecological laboratory in the 2014,
 2015, 2016, 2017, 2018, 2019, or 2020 tax year. The change in law
 made by this Act applies to land to which this subsection applies
 beginning with the tax year that begins January 1, 2027. For the
 2021, 2022, 2023, 2024, 2025, and 2026 tax years, the qualification
 of land to which this subsection applies for appraisal under
 Subchapter D, Chapter 23, Tax Code, on the basis of its use as an
 ecological laboratory is governed by the law as it existed
 immediately before the effective date of this Act, and the former
 law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2021.
 * * * * *