Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB685 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/10/2019

                    By: Clardy, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Hughes) H.B. No. 685
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 24, 2019;
 April 25, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 10, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 10, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to immunity from liability of a court clerk and county for
 the disclosure or release of certain court documents and
 information contained in the court documents.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter G, Chapter 51, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 51.609 to read as follows:
 Sec. 51.609.  IMMUNITY FROM LIABILITY FOR DISCLOSURE OR
 RELEASE OF COURT DOCUMENTS. (a) In this section:
 (1)  "Court clerk" means the clerk of the supreme court
 or the court of criminal appeals or the clerk of a court of appeals
 district court, county court, statutory county court, statutory
 probate court, justice court, or municipal court.
 (2)  "State court document database" means a database
 accessible by the public and established or authorized by the
 supreme court for storing documents filed with a court in this
 state.
 (b)  A court clerk is not responsible for the management or
 removal of a document from a state court document database and is
 not liable for damages resulting from the release of a document in
 the database if the clerk in good faith performs the duties as clerk
 as provided by law and the Texas Rules of Civil Procedure.
 (c)  If a court clerk in good faith performs the duties as a
 clerk as provided by law and the Texas Rules of Civil Procedure, the
 clerk, the county in which the court is located, and the
 commissioners court of the county in which the court is located are
 immune from suit and from liability for the release or disclosure of
 information that is confidential or otherwise prohibited from
 disclosure by law, rule, or court order and that is accessed from a
 state court document database.
 (d)  A court clerk is not liable for the release of a sealed
 or confidential document in the clerk's custody unless the clerk
 acted intentionally, or with malice, reckless disregard, or gross
 negligence in the release of the document.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *