Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB692 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/09/2019

                    By: White, Wu (Senate Sponsor - Watson) H.B. No. 692
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2019;
 April 15, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Administration; May 9, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0;
 May 9, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 692 By:  Huffman


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the suspension of a student who is homeless from public
 school.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 37.005, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  A school district or open-enrollment charter school may
 not place a student who is homeless in out-of-school suspension
 unless the student engages in conduct described by Subsections
 (c)(1)-(3) while on school property or while attending a
 school-sponsored or school-related activity on or off of school
 property.  The campus behavior coordinator may coordinate with the
 school district's homeless education liaison to identify
 appropriate alternatives to out-of-school suspension for a student
 who is homeless. In this subsection, "student who is homeless" has
 the meaning assigned to the term "homeless children and youths"
 under 42 U.S.C. Section 11434a.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies beginning with the 2019-2020
 school year.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *