Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB70 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/09/2019

                    By: González of El Paso, et al. H.B. No. 70
 (Senate Sponsor - Hall)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 30, 2019;
 May 7, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Agriculture; May 9, 2019, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 9, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a strategic plan goal by the Department of Agriculture
 to prevent crop diseases and plant pests in this state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 12, Agriculture Code, is amended by
 adding Section 12.008 to read as follows:
 Sec. 12.008.  STRATEGIC PLAN GOAL: CROP DISEASE AND PLANT
 PEST PREVENTION. The department shall include in the department's
 strategic plan required under Chapter 2056, Government Code, a goal
 of preventing crop diseases and plant pests in this state by:
 (1)  improving the department's preventative
 management practices concerning crop diseases and plant pests;
 (2)  increasing the performance of activities directly
 related to crop disease and plant pest prevention;
 (3)  creating and implementing a strong surveillance
 program that includes activities designed to:
 (A)  identify and locate any possible source of
 infection or exposure to domestic or foreign diseases or pests that
 affect crops grown in this state; and
 (B)  aid the department in the early detection of
 any domestic, foreign, or emerging crop diseases and plant pests;
 (4)  evaluating the department's diagnostic procedures
 to ensure the performance of diagnostic evaluations and
 investigations occurs timely and accurately;
 (5)  improving the effectiveness of the department's
 control and eradication methods;
 (6)  evaluating and expanding, if necessary, the
 department's emergency management activities related to crop
 diseases and plant pests; and
 (7)  addressing how the department will educate
 farmers, agricultural producers, and communities that sustain
 agriculture in this state about crop disease and plant pest
 prevention.
 SECTION 2.  The Department of Agriculture shall, using
 existing funds, include in the first strategic plan under Chapter
 2056, Government Code, issued after the effective date of this Act
 the goal and methods of implementing the goal required by Section
 12.008, Agriculture Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *