Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB770 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/14/2019

                    By: Davis of Harris (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 770
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2019;
 May 7, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 14, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 14, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of an electronic database for
 settlement agreements for certain suits involving minors or
 incapacitated persons; authorizing a fee.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 72, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 72.034 to read as follows:
 Sec. 72.034.  SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT DATABASE. (a) The
 office shall establish and maintain an electronic database that
 contains personal injury or wrongful death settlement agreements
 for which a minor or incapacitated person is the beneficiary. A
 party to the agreement or a guardian, next friend, or guardian ad
 litem may record the agreement in the database.  Only one copy of an
 agreement may be filed by the parties or the guardian, next friend,
 or guardian ad litem in each settlement agreement.
 (b)  A settlement agreement recorded in the database is
 confidential, and the office shall ensure that a settlement
 agreement may be accessed only by:
 (1)  the parties to the settlement agreement;
 (2)  each attorney representing a party to the
 settlement agreement; or
 (3)  the guardian, next friend, or guardian ad litem of
 a party to the settlement agreement.
 (c)  The office may set and collect a fee to record a
 settlement agreement in the database in an amount sufficient to
 cover the costs of maintaining the agreement in the database, not to
 exceed $50 for each agreement.
 (d)  Any fee to record a settlement agreement in the database
 established by the office as provided by Subsection (c) is a court
 cost to be included for payment in the settlement agreement.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies to a
 suit filed on behalf of a minor or incapacitated person that is
 pending in a trial court on the effective date of this Act or that is
 filed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *