Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB793 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/29/2019

                    By: King of Parker, et al. H.B. No. 793
 (Senate Sponsor - Creighton)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2019;
 April 15, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Business & Commerce; April 29, 2019, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 1; April 29, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain government contracts with companies that
 boycott Israel.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2270.001(2), Government Code, as added
 by Chapter 1 (H.B. 89), Acts of the 85th Legislature, Regular
 Session, 2017, is amended to read as follows:
 (2)  "Company" has the meaning assigned by Section
 808.001, except that the term does not include a sole
 proprietorship.
 SECTION 2.  Section 2270.002, Government Code, as added by
 Chapter 1 (H.B. 89), Acts of the 85th Legislature, Regular Session,
 2017, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 2270.002.  PROVISION REQUIRED IN CONTRACT.  (a) This
 section applies only to a contract that:
 (1)  is between a governmental entity and a company
 with 10 or more full-time employees; and
 (2)  has a value of $100,000 or more that is to be paid
 wholly or partly from public funds of the governmental entity.
 (b)  A governmental entity may not enter into a contract with
 a company for goods or services unless the contract contains a
 written verification from the company that it:
 (1)  does not boycott Israel; and
 (2)  will not boycott Israel during the term of the
 contract.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *