Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB81 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/29/2019

                    By: Canales, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa) H.B. No. 81
 (In the Senate - Received from the House March 25, 2019;
 March 27, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Business & Commerce; April 29, 2019, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 29, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the disclosure under the public information law of
 certain information related to parades, concerts, or other
 entertainment events open to the general public that are paid for
 with public funds.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 552.104, Government Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (c) to read as
 follows:
 (b)  Except as provided by Subsection (c), the [The]
 requirement of Section 552.022 that a category of information
 listed under Section 552.022(a) is public information and not
 excepted from required disclosure under this chapter unless
 expressly confidential under law does not apply to information that
 is excepted from required disclosure under this section.
 (c)  Subsection (b) does not apply to information described
 by Section 552.022(a) relating to the receipt or expenditure of
 public or other funds by a governmental body for a parade, concert,
 or other entertainment event paid for in whole or part with public
 funds.  A person, including a governmental body, may not include a
 provision in a contract related to an event described by this
 subsection that prohibits or would otherwise prevent the disclosure
 of information described by this subsection.  A contract provision
 that violates this subsection is void.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to:
 (1)  a request for information that is received by a
 governmental body or an officer for public information on or after
 the effective date of this Act; and
 (2)  a contract entered into or renewed on or after the
 effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *