Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB811 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/03/2019

                    By: White, Wu (Senate Sponsor - West) H.B. No. 811
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2019;
 April 15, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Administration; May 3, 2019, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 3, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to determining appropriate disciplinary action to be taken
 against a public school student who is in foster care or who is
 homeless.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 37.001(a), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  The board of trustees of an independent school district
 shall, with the advice of its district-level committee established
 under Subchapter F, Chapter 11, adopt a student code of conduct for
 the district. The student code of conduct must be posted and
 prominently displayed at each school campus or made available for
 review at the office of the campus principal. In addition to
 establishing standards for student conduct, the student code of
 conduct must:
 (1)  specify the circumstances, in accordance with this
 subchapter, under which a student may be removed from a classroom,
 campus, disciplinary alternative education program, or vehicle
 owned or operated by the district;
 (2)  specify conditions that authorize or require a
 principal or other appropriate administrator to transfer a student
 to a disciplinary alternative education program;
 (3)  outline conditions under which a student may be
 suspended as provided by Section 37.005 or expelled as provided by
 Section 37.007;
 (4)  specify that consideration will be given, as a
 factor in each decision concerning suspension, removal to a
 disciplinary alternative education program, expulsion, or
 placement in a juvenile justice alternative education program,
 regardless of whether the decision concerns a mandatory or
 discretionary action, to:
 (A)  self-defense;
 (B)  intent or lack of intent at the time the
 student engaged in the conduct;
 (C)  a student's disciplinary history; [or]
 (D)  a disability that substantially impairs the
 student's capacity to appreciate the wrongfulness of the student's
 conduct;
 (E)  a student's status in the conservatorship of
 the Department of Family and Protective Services; or
 (F)  a student's status as a student who is
 homeless;
 (5)  provide guidelines for setting the length of a
 term of:
 (A)  a removal under Section 37.006; and
 (B)  an expulsion under Section 37.007;
 (6)  address the notification of a student's parent or
 guardian of a violation of the student code of conduct committed by
 the student that results in suspension, removal to a disciplinary
 alternative education program, or expulsion;
 (7)  prohibit bullying, harassment, and making hit
 lists and ensure that district employees enforce those
 prohibitions;
 (8)  provide, as appropriate for students at each grade
 level, methods, including options, for:
 (A)  managing students in the classroom, on school
 grounds, and on a vehicle owned or operated by the district;
 (B)  disciplining students; and
 (C)  preventing and intervening in student
 discipline problems, including bullying, harassment, and making
 hit lists; and
 (9)  include an explanation of the provisions regarding
 refusal of entry to or ejection from district property under
 Section 37.105, including the appeal process established under
 Section 37.105(h).
 SECTION 2.  Section 37.001(b), Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subdivision (4) to read as follows:
 (4)  "Student who is homeless" has the meaning assigned
 to the term "homeless children and youths" under 42 U.S.C. Section
 11434a.
 SECTION 3.  This Act applies beginning with the 2019-2020
 school year.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *