Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB861 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/13/2019

                    By: Anchia, Wray (Senate Sponsor - Campbell) H.B. No. 861
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2019;
 April 24, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Property Tax; May 13, 2019, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 13, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the calculation of penalties and interest resulting
 from the final determination of an ad valorem tax appeal that
 changes a property owner's tax liability.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 42.42(c) and (d), Tax Code, are amended
 to read as follows:
 (c)  If the final determination of an appeal occurs after the
 property owner has paid a portion of the tax finally determined to
 be due as required by Section 42.08, the assessor for each affected
 taxing unit shall prepare and mail a supplemental tax bill in the
 form and manner prescribed by Subsection (b). The additional tax is
 due and becomes delinquent as provided by Subsection (b). If the
 additional tax is not paid by the delinquency date for the
 additional tax, [but] the property owner is liable for penalties
 and interest on the tax included in the supplemental bill
 calculated as provided by Section 33.01 as if the tax included in
 the supplemental bill became delinquent on the original delinquency
 date prescribed by Chapter 31.
 (d)  If the property owner did not pay any portion of the
 taxes imposed on the property because the court found that payment
 would constitute an unreasonable restraint on the owner's right of
 access to the courts as provided by Section 42.08(d), after the
 final determination of the appeal the assessor for each affected
 taxing unit shall prepare and mail a supplemental tax bill in the
 form and manner prescribed by Subsection (b). The additional tax is
 due and becomes delinquent as provided by Subsection (b). If the
 additional tax is not paid by the delinquency date for the
 additional tax, [but] the property owner is liable for interest on
 the tax included in the supplemental bill calculated as provided by
 Section 33.01 as if the tax included in the supplemental bill became
 delinquent on the delinquency date prescribed by Chapter 31.
 SECTION 2.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 an appeal under Chapter 42, Tax Code, that is filed on or after the
 effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *