Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB872 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/13/2019

                    By: Hefner, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Flores, Lucio) H.B. No. 872
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2019;
 April 29, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 13, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 13, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 872 By:  Huffman


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to financial assistance paid to the survivors of certain
 law enforcement officers and other public employees killed in the
 line of duty.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 615.041, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 615.041.  CONSIDERATION AND DETERMINATION [PROOF] OF
 CLAIM; COMPELLED COMPLIANCE.  (a)  Not later than the 30th day [As
 soon as practicable] after the date of the death of an individual
 listed under Section 615.003 that occurs in the performance of
 duties in the individual's position as described by Section 615.003
 or as a result of an action that occurs while the individual is
 performing those duties [is claimed to meet the requirements of
 Section 615.021(1)], the individual's employing entity shall
 furnish to the board of trustees of the Employees Retirement System
 of Texas proof of the death in the form and with additional evidence
 and information required by the board.  The employing entity shall
 furnish the evidence and information required under this subsection
 regardless of whether the employing entity believes the
 individual's death satisfies the eligibility requirements
 established under Section 615.021(a)(1).
 (b)  The board of trustees shall consider the proof,
 evidence, and information provided under Subsection (a), and any
 additional information required by the rules adopted in accordance
 with Section 615.002, to determine whether the individual's death
 satisfies the eligibility requirements established under Section
 615.021(a)(1) and justifies the payment of assistance to the
 individual's eligible survivors under this chapter.
 (c)  If the individual's employing entity fails to comply
 with Subsection (a), the attorney general may use any means
 authorized by law, including filing suit for a writ of mandamus
 against the employer, to compel the employer's compliance with this
 section.
 SECTION 2.  Section 615.121(a), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  The state shall pay the following benefits to an
 eligible surviving spouse of a peace officer, a jailer, a county
 jailer or guard, or an employee of the Texas Department of Criminal
 Justice, as described by Section 615.003(1), (4), [or] (6), or (7),
 who was killed in the line of duty and who had not qualified for an
 annuity under an employees' retirement plan:
 (1)  funeral expenses related to the deceased person
 [officer or employee]; and
 (2)  monthly payments that equal the greater of:
 (A)  the monthly annuity payment the deceased
 person [officer or employee] would have received if the deceased
 person [officer or employee] had survived, had retired on the last
 day of the month in which the person [officer or employee] died, and
 had been eligible to receive an annuity under an employees'
 retirement plan; or
 (B)  the minimum monthly annuity payment the
 deceased person [officer or employee] would have received if the
 person [officer or employee] had been employed by the state for 10
 years, had been paid a salary at the lowest amount provided by the
 General Appropriations Act for a position of peace officer, jailer,
 county jailer or guard, or employee of the Texas Department of
 Criminal Justice, as described by Section 615.003(1), (4), [or]
 (6), or (7), and had been eligible to retire under the Employees
 Retirement System of Texas.
 SECTION 3.  Section 615.041, Government Code, as amended by
 this Act, applies to the payment of assistance in connection with a
 death that occurs on or after the effective date of this Act. The
 payment of assistance in connection with a death that occurs before
 the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect
 immediately before the effective date of this Act, and that law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  Section 615.121(a), Government Code, as amended
 by this Act, applies to a payment of assistance to survivors of
 certain law enforcement officers and employees on or after the
 effective date of this Act regardless of the date the officer or
 employee died.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *