Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB884 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/13/2019

                    By: Raney, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Schwertner) H.B. No. 884
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2019;
 May 7, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 13, 2019, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 13, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of a portion of Business State Highway
 6-R in Brazos County as the Carolyn and John David Crow Memorial
 Parkway.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 225.152 to read as follows:
 Sec. 225.152.  CAROLYN AND JOHN DAVID CROW MEMORIAL PARKWAY.
 (a) The portion of Business State Highway 6-R in Brazos County
 between its intersection with East Villa Maria Road and its
 intersection with Krenek Tap Road is designated as the Carolyn and
 John David Crow Memorial Parkway. This designation is in addition
 to any other designation.
 (b)  Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall:
 (1)  design and construct markers indicating the
 designation as the Carolyn and John David Crow Memorial Parkway and
 any other appropriate information; and
 (2)  erect a marker at each end of the parkway and at
 appropriate intermediate sites along the parkway.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *