Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB888 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/15/2019

                    By: Landgraf, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Perry) H.B. No. 888
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2019;
 May 6, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 15, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 15, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 888 By:  Zaffirini


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to creating the criminal offense of misrepresenting a
 child as a family member at a port of entry.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 37, Penal Code, is amended by adding
 Section 37.082 to read as follows:
 Sec. 37.082.  MISREPRESENTING CHILD AS FAMILY MEMBER AT PORT
 OF ENTRY. (a) In this section:
 (1)  "Child" means a person younger than 18 years of
 age.
 (2)  "Family member" means a person who is related to
 another person by consanguinity or affinity.
 (3)  "Port of entry" means a place designated by
 executive order of the president of the United States, by order of
 the United States secretary of the treasury, or by act of the United
 States Congress at which a customs officer is authorized to enforce
 customs laws.
 (b)  A person commits an offense if the person, with intent
 to commit an offense under Section 20A.02, knowingly misrepresents
 a child as a family member of the person to a peace officer or
 federal special investigator at a port of entry.
 (c)  An offense under this section is a Class B misdemeanor.
 (d)  If conduct that constitutes an offense under this
 section also constitutes an offense under another law, the actor
 may be prosecuted under this section, the other law, or both.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *