Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB892 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/06/2019

                    By: Kuempel, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Hughes) H.B. No. 892
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 16, 2019;
 April 17, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 6, 2019, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 6, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to county regulation of game rooms.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 234.132, Local Government Code, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *