Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB963 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/15/2019

                    By: Bell of Montgomery, et al. H.B. No. 963
 (Senate Sponsor - Taylor)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 2, 2019;
 May 3, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 15, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 11, Nays 0;
 May 15, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 963 By:  Taylor


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a review by the State Board of Education of the
 essential knowledge and skills of the career and technology and
 technology applications curriculums.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Not later than March 1, 2020, the State Board of
 Education shall:
 (1)  conduct a review of the essential knowledge and
 skills of the career and technology and technology applications
 curriculums; and
 (2)  amend the board's rules in the Texas
 Administrative Code to consolidate the technology applications
 courses for grades 9 through 12 in 19 T.A.C. Chapter 126, Subchapter
 C, with the career and technical education courses in 19 T.A.C.
 Chapter 130, and eliminate duplicative courses while ensuring
 certifications are aligned with the rigor of each individual
 course.
 SECTION 2.  The State Board of Education is required to
 implement a provision of this Act only if the legislature
 appropriates money specifically for that purpose. If the
 legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that
 purpose, the State Board of Education may, but is not required to,
 implement a provision of this Act using other appropriations
 available for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *