Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB963 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/25/2019

                    H.B. No. 963


 AN ACT
 relating to the availability of school district trustee information
 on the Internet and a review of the essential knowledge and skills
 of certain curricula.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter D, Chapter 11, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 11.1518 to read as follows:
 Sec. 11.1518.  TRUSTEE INFORMATION POSTED ON WEBSITE. (a)
 Each school district that maintains an Internet website shall post
 on the website the name, e-mail address, and term of office,
 including the date the term began and the date the term expires, of
 each member of the district's board of trustees.
 (b)  If a school district does not maintain an Internet
 website, the district shall submit the information required by
 Subsection (a) to the agency. On receipt of the district's
 information, the agency shall post the information on the agency's
 Internet website.
 (c)  Each time there is a change in the membership of a school
 district's board of trustees, the district shall update the
 information required under Subsection (a) and, as applicable:
 (1)  post the updated information on the district's
 Internet website; or
 (2)  submit the updated information to the agency for
 posting on the agency's Internet website in accordance with
 Subsection (b).
 SECTION 2.  Not later than March 1, 2020, the State Board of
 Education shall:
 (1)  conduct a review of the essential knowledge and
 skills of the career and technology and technology applications
 curricula; and
 (2)  amend the board's rules in the Texas
 Administrative Code to consolidate the technology applications
 courses for grades 9 through 12 in 19 T.A.C. Chapter 126, Subchapter
 C, with the career and technical education courses in 19 T.A.C.
 Chapter 130, and eliminate duplicative courses while ensuring
 certifications are aligned with the rigor of each individual
 course.
 SECTION 3.  The State Board of Education is required to
 implement a provision of this Act only if the legislature
 appropriates money specifically for that purpose. If the
 legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that
 purpose, the State Board of Education may, but is not required to,
 implement a provision of this Act using other appropriations
 available for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 963 was passed by the House on May 2,
 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 138, Nays 3, 1 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 963 on May 23, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 122, Nays 18,
 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 963 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 19, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays
 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor