Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB971 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/10/2019

                    By: Clardy, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 971
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2019;
 April 29, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Veteran Affairs & Border Security; May 10, 2019, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 10, 2019, sent
 to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to proficiency certification of law enforcement officers
 with military service.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1701.402, Occupations Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (o) to read as follows:
 (o)  The commission shall adopt rules to allow an officer who
 has served in the military to receive credit toward meeting any
 training hours required for an intermediate, advanced, or master
 proficiency certificate based on that military service.
 SECTION 2.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the Texas Commission on Law Enforcement shall adopt
 rules necessary to implement Section 1701.402(o), Occupations
 Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *