By: Metcalf, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Taylor) H.B. No. 974 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 7, 2019; May 8, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Education; May 17, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 17, 2019, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to public school safety measures and procedures. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 11.159, Education Code, is amended by adding Subsection (b-1) to read as follows: (b-1) The State Board of Education shall require a trustee to complete training on school safety. The state board, in coordination with the Texas School Safety Center, shall develop the curriculum and materials for the training. SECTION 2. Section 38.022, Education Code, is amended by amending Subsections (a) and (c) and adding Subsections (c-1), (c-2), and (e) to read as follows: (a) A school district shall [may] require a person who enters a district campus for a purpose other than to attend a school-sponsored event that is open to the public to display the person's driver's license or another form of identification containing the person's photograph issued by a governmental entity. (c) A school district shall [may] verify whether a person who visits [visitor to] a district campus for a purpose other than to attend a school-sponsored event that is open to the public is a sex offender registered with the computerized central database maintained by the Department of Public Safety as provided by Article 62.005, Code of Criminal Procedure, or any other database accessible by the district. (c-1) A school district may verify whether a person who visits a district campus to attend a school-sponsored event that is open to the public is a sex offender registered with the computerized central database maintained by the Department of Public Safety as provided by Article 62.005, Code of Criminal Procedure, or any other database accessible by the district. (c-2) A school district may: (1) develop a form of identification containing a person's photograph that is valid only during the school year for which it is issued; and (2) issue that form of identification to a student's parent or guardian who does not possess any other form of identification described by Subsection (a). (e) For purposes of this section, an event is a school-sponsored event that is open to the public if the event is held on a district campus and individuals other than district employees or students are encouraged, invited, or permitted to attend. SECTION 3. This Act applies beginning with the 2019-2020 school year. SECTION 4. Not later than January 1, 2020, the State Board of Education, in coordination with the Texas School Safety Center, shall develop the curriculum and materials for the training on school safety required under Section 11.159(b-1), Education Code, as added by this Act. SECTION 5. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2019. * * * * *