Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB979 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/09/2019

                    By: Hernandez, Smith (Senate Sponsor - Perry) H.B. No. 979
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2019;
 April 24, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Criminal Justice; May 9, 2019, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 9, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of DNA records for certain defendants for
 inclusion in the DNA database system.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 411.1471(a), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  This section applies to a defendant who is:
 (1)  indicted or waives indictment for a felony
 prohibited or punishable under any of the following Penal Code
 sections:
 (A)  Section 20.04(a)(4);
 (B)  Section 21.11;
 (C)  Section 22.011;
 (D)  Section 22.021;
 (E)  Section 25.02;
 (F)  Section 30.02(d);
 (G)  Section 43.05;
 (H)  Section 43.25;
 (I)  Section 43.26;
 (J)  Section 21.02; or
 (K)  Section 20A.03;
 (2)  arrested for a felony described by Subdivision (1)
 after having been previously convicted of or placed on deferred
 adjudication for an offense described by Subdivision (1) or an
 offense punishable under Section 30.02(c)(2), Penal Code; or
 (3)  convicted of an offense:
 (A)  under Title 5, Penal Code, other than an
 offense described by Subdivision (1), that is punishable as a Class
 A misdemeanor or any higher category of offense, except for an
 offense punishable as a Class A misdemeanor under Section [20.02,
 22.01, or] 22.05, Penal Code; or
 (B)  under Section 21.08, 25.04, 43.02(b), 43.03,
 or 43.24, Penal Code.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the offense was committed,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For
 purposes of this section, an offense was committed before the
 effective date of this Act if any element of the offense occurred
 before that date.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *