Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB994 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/16/2019

                    86R20749 CJC-F
 By: Guillen H.B. No. 994
 Substitute the following for H.B. No. 994:
 By:  Murphy C.S.H.B. No. 994


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the procedures for protests and appeals of certain ad
 valorem tax determinations.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 41.45(b), Tax Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 (b)  A property owner initiating a protest is entitled to
 appear to offer evidence or argument.  A property owner may offer
 evidence or argument by affidavit without personally appearing and
 may appear by telephone conference call to offer argument.  A
 property owner who appears by telephone conference call must offer
 any evidence by affidavit.  A property owner must submit an
 affidavit described by this subsection to the board hearing the
 protest before the board begins the hearing on the protest.  On
 receipt of an affidavit, the board shall notify the chief
 appraiser. The chief appraiser [may inspect the affidavit and] is
 entitled to a copy of the affidavit on request. The board and the
 chief appraiser shall review the evidence or argument provided by
 the property owner before the hearing on the protest.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 42, Tax Code, is amended by adding
 Subchapter B-1 to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER B-1. APPEALS FROM APPRAISAL REVIEW BOARD DETERMINATIONS
 IN CERTAIN COUNTIES
 Sec. 42.35.  APPLICABILITY OF SUBCHAPTER. This subchapter
 applies only to the appeal of an order issued by an appraisal review
 board that is located in a county:
 (1)  that has a population of less than 45,500;
 (2)  that shares a border with a county that has a
 population of 1.5 million or more and is within 200 miles of an
 international border; and
 (3)  through which the Atascosa River flows.
 Sec. 42.36.  APPEALS TO JUSTICE COURT. (a) As an
 alternative to bringing an appeal under Section 42.01(a)(1) to a
 district court as provided by Subchapter B, a property owner may
 bring the appeal to a justice court if:
 (1)  the appeal relates only to a claim of excessive
 appraisal of property that qualifies as the owner's residence
 homestead; and
 (2)  the appraised value of the property as determined
 by the appraisal review board and stated in the order being appealed
 is $500,000 or less.
 (b)  Venue of an action brought under Section 42.01(a)(1) in
 justice court is in any justice precinct in which the property that
 is the subject of the order being appealed is located.
 (c)  If the justice court determines that the justice court
 does not have jurisdiction of the appeal, the court shall dismiss
 the appeal. In that event, the property owner may appeal the order
 to a district court by filing a petition for review with the
 district court not later than the 30th day after the date of the
 dismissal.
 (d)  Sections 42.21, 42.23, 42.24, and 42.25 apply to an
 appeal brought under Section 42.01(a)(1) to a justice court in the
 same manner as those sections apply to an appeal brought under
 Section 42.01(a)(1) to a district court.
 Sec. 42.37.  REPRESENTATION IN JUSTICE COURT. In an appeal
 brought under Section 42.01(a)(1) to a justice court, an appraisal
 district may be, but is not required to be, represented by legal
 counsel.
 Sec. 42.38.  EXPIRATION OF SUBCHAPTER. This subchapter
 expires September 1, 2025.
 SECTION 3.  On the expiration of Subchapter B-1, Chapter 42,
 Tax Code, as added by this Act, the Office of Court Administration
 of the Texas Judicial System, using existing resources, shall
 conduct a study on that subchapter's effectiveness in increasing
 court efficiency and improving property owners' ability to exercise
 their appeal rights under Chapter 42, Tax Code. Not later than
 December 1, 2026, the office shall issue a report on the study to
 the appropriate standing committees of the house of representatives
 and the senate. The report must include the office's
 recommendation as to whether the legislature, in the next regular
 legislative session following the issuance of the report, should
 enact legislation similar to Subchapter B-1, Chapter 42, Tax Code,
 as added by this Act.
 SECTION 4.  An appeal under Subchapter B-1, Chapter 42, Tax
 Code, as added by this Act, that is pending on September 1, 2025, is
 governed by that subchapter as it existed on August 31, 2025, and
 that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 5.  The change in law made by this Act applies to the
 appeal of an order of an appraisal review board without regard to
 whether the order was issued before the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.