Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR9 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 04/16/2019

                    H.C.R. No. 9


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, Section 17, Article III, Texas Constitution,
 provides that neither house of the legislature may adjourn for more
 than three days without the consent of the other house; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED by the 86th Legislature of the State of Texas, That
 each house grant the other permission to adjourn for more than three
 days during the period beginning on Wednesday, April 17, 2019, and
 ending on Tuesday, April 23, 2019.
 Moody
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 9 was adopted by the House on
 April 15, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 142, Nays 0, 2 present,
 not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 9 was adopted by the Senate on
 April 16, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 RECEIVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Secretary of State