Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HJR34 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/17/2019

                    By: Shine, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Bettencourt) H.J.R. No. 34
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2019;
 May 1, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Property
 Tax; May 17, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 17, 2019,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.J.R. No. 34 By:  Bettencourt


 HOUSE JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the legislature
 to provide for a temporary exemption from ad valorem taxation of a
 portion of the appraised value of certain property damaged by a
 disaster.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2, Article VIII, Texas Constitution, is
 amended by adding Subsection (e) to read as follows:
 (e)  The Legislature by general law may provide that a person
 who owns property located in an area declared by the governor to be
 a disaster area following a disaster is entitled to a temporary
 exemption from ad valorem taxation by a political subdivision of a
 portion of the appraised value of that property. The Legislature by
 general law may prescribe the method of determining the amount of
 the exemption authorized by this subsection and the duration of the
 exemption and may provide additional eligibility requirements for
 the exemption.
 SECTION 2.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 5, 2019.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment authorizing the
 legislature to provide for a temporary exemption from ad valorem
 taxation of a portion of the appraised value of certain property
 damaged by a disaster."
 * * * * *