Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HJR72 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/14/2019

                    By: White (Senate Sponsor - Huffman) H.J.R. No. 72
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 17, 2019;
 May 1, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 14, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 14, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 HOUSE JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment permitting a person to hold
 more than one office as a municipal judge at the same time.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 40, Article XVI, Texas Constitution, is
 amended by adding Subsection (e) to read as follows:
 (e)  Notwithstanding Subsections (a) and (c) of this
 section, a person may hold more than one office as an elected or
 appointed municipal judge in more than one municipality at the same
 time.
 SECTION 2.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 5, 2019.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment permitting a person to
 hold more than one office as a municipal judge at the same time."
 * * * * *