Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HR114 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 03/12/2019

                    H.R. No. 114


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, North Texas residents were deeply saddened by the
 loss of Officer David Charles Sherrard of the Richardson Police
 Department, who was killed in the line of duty on February 7, 2018,
 at the age of 37; and
 WHEREAS, The son of Margaret and Alvin Sherrard, David
 Sherrard was born on October 9, 1980, and grew up in Dallas and
 Mesquite with a sister, Cristal, and a brother, Mark; he married his
 high school sweetheart, the former M. Nicole Bradley, in Dallas on
 November 9, 2002, and they were blessed with two daughters, Emily
 and Grace; devoted to his family, Officer Sherrard enjoyed caring
 for his children and surprising his wife with little gifts; he was
 sustained by a strong faith and read the Bible regularly for
 guidance; and
 WHEREAS, Officer Sherrard was a 13-year veteran of the
 Richardson Police, and he served on the SWAT team for a decade;
 while demonstrating exceptional skill and selfless dedication, he
 also knew how to lighten the mood with his wonderful sense of humor;
 his leadership enhanced the effectiveness of the team, and he was a
 mentor to many younger officers; and
 WHEREAS, A courageous law enforcement officer, David
 Sherrard embodied the highest ideals of his profession, and
 although he is greatly missed by all who were privileged to share in
 his love and friendship, his heroism will remain a lasting source of
 inspiration; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 86th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the memory of Officer David
 Charles Sherrard of the Richardson Police Department and extend
 profound sympathy to his family, friends, and fellow officers; and,
 be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Officer
 David Charles Sherrard.
 Leach
 Button
 Bonnen of Brazoria Guerra Oliverson Bonnen of Brazoria Guerra Oliverson
Bonnen of Brazoria Guerra Oliverson
 Allen Guillen Ortega Allen Guillen Ortega
Allen Guillen Ortega
 Allison Gutierrez Pacheco Allison Gutierrez Pacheco
Allison Gutierrez Pacheco
 Anchia Harless Paddie Anchia Harless Paddie
Anchia Harless Paddie
 Anderson Harris Parker Anderson Harris Parker
Anderson Harris Parker
 Ashby Hefner Patterson Ashby Hefner Patterson
Ashby Hefner Patterson
 Bailes Hernandez Paul Bailes Hernandez Paul
Bailes Hernandez Paul
 Beckley Herrero Perez Beckley Herrero Perez
Beckley Herrero Perez
 Bell of Kaufman Hinojosa Phelan Bell of Kaufman Hinojosa Phelan
Bell of Kaufman Hinojosa Phelan
 Bell of Montgomery Holland Price Bell of Montgomery Holland Price
Bell of Montgomery Holland Price
 Bernal Howard Ramos Bernal Howard Ramos
Bernal Howard Ramos
 Biedermann Huberty Raney Biedermann Huberty Raney
Biedermann Huberty Raney
 Blanco Hunter Raymond Blanco Hunter Raymond
Blanco Hunter Raymond
 Bohac Israel Reynolds Bohac Israel Reynolds
Bohac Israel Reynolds
 Bonnen of Galveston E. Johnson of Dallas Rodriguez Bonnen of Galveston E. Johnson of Dallas Rodriguez
Bonnen of Galveston E. Johnson of Dallas Rodriguez
 Bowers J. Johnson of Dallas Romero, Jr. Bowers J. Johnson of Dallas Romero, Jr.
Bowers J. Johnson of Dallas Romero, Jr.
 Buckley Johnson of Harris Rose Buckley Johnson of Harris Rose
Buckley Johnson of Harris Rose
 Bucy Kacal Rosenthal Bucy Kacal Rosenthal
Bucy Kacal Rosenthal
 Burns King of Hemphill Sanford Burns King of Hemphill Sanford
Burns King of Hemphill Sanford
 Burrows King of Parker Schaefer Burrows King of Parker Schaefer
Burrows King of Parker Schaefer
 Button King of Uvalde Shaheen Button King of Uvalde Shaheen
Button King of Uvalde Shaheen
 Cain Klick Sheffield Cain Klick Sheffield
Cain Klick Sheffield
 Calanni Krause Sherman, Sr. Calanni Krause Sherman, Sr.
Calanni Krause Sherman, Sr.
 Canales Kuempel Shine Canales Kuempel Shine
Canales Kuempel Shine
 Capriglione Lambert Smith Capriglione Lambert Smith
Capriglione Lambert Smith
 Clardy Landgraf Smithee Clardy Landgraf Smithee
Clardy Landgraf Smithee
 Cole Lang Springer Cole Lang Springer
Cole Lang Springer
 Coleman Larson Stephenson Coleman Larson Stephenson
Coleman Larson Stephenson
 Collier Leach Stickland Collier Leach Stickland
Collier Leach Stickland
 Cortez Leman Stucky Cortez Leman Stucky
Cortez Leman Stucky
 Craddick Longoria Swanson Craddick Longoria Swanson
Craddick Longoria Swanson
 Cyrier Lozano Talarico Cyrier Lozano Talarico
Cyrier Lozano Talarico
 Darby Lucio III Thierry Darby Lucio III Thierry
Darby Lucio III Thierry
 Davis of Dallas Martinez Thompson of Brazoria Davis of Dallas Martinez Thompson of Brazoria
Davis of Dallas Martinez Thompson of Brazoria
 Davis of Harris Martinez Fischer Thompson of Harris Davis of Harris Martinez Fischer Thompson of Harris
Davis of Harris Martinez Fischer Thompson of Harris
 Dean Metcalf Tinderholt Dean Metcalf Tinderholt
Dean Metcalf Tinderholt
 Deshotel Meyer Toth Deshotel Meyer Toth
Deshotel Meyer Toth
 Dominguez Meza Turner of Dallas Dominguez Meza Turner of Dallas
Dominguez Meza Turner of Dallas
 Dutton Middleton Turner of Tarrant Dutton Middleton Turner of Tarrant
Dutton Middleton Turner of Tarrant
 Farrar Miller VanDeaver Farrar Miller VanDeaver
Farrar Miller VanDeaver
 Fierro Minjarez Vo Fierro Minjarez Vo
Fierro Minjarez Vo
 Flynn Moody Walle Flynn Moody Walle
Flynn Moody Walle
 Frank Morrison White Frank Morrison White
Frank Morrison White
 Frullo Muñoz, Jr. Wilson Frullo Muñoz, Jr. Wilson
Frullo Muñoz, Jr. Wilson
 Geren Murphy Wray Geren Murphy Wray
Geren Murphy Wray
 Gervin-Hawkins Murr Wu Gervin-Hawkins Murr Wu
Gervin-Hawkins Murr Wu
 Goldman Neave Zedler Goldman Neave Zedler
Goldman Neave Zedler
 González of Dallas Nevárez Zerwas González of Dallas Nevárez Zerwas
González of Dallas Nevárez Zerwas
 González of El Paso Noble Zwiener González of El Paso Noble Zwiener
González of El Paso Noble Zwiener
 Goodwin Goodwin
Goodwin
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 114 was unanimously adopted by a rising
 vote of the House on March 6, 2019.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House



Bonnen of Brazoria Guerra Oliverson

Allen Guillen Ortega

Allison Gutierrez Pacheco

Anchia Harless Paddie

Anderson Harris Parker

Ashby Hefner Patterson

Bailes Hernandez Paul

Beckley Herrero Perez

Bell of Kaufman Hinojosa Phelan

Bell of Montgomery Holland Price

Bernal Howard Ramos

Biedermann Huberty Raney

Blanco Hunter Raymond

Bohac Israel Reynolds

Bonnen of Galveston E. Johnson of Dallas Rodriguez

Bowers J. Johnson of Dallas Romero, Jr.

Buckley Johnson of Harris Rose

Bucy Kacal Rosenthal

Burns King of Hemphill Sanford

Burrows King of Parker Schaefer

Button King of Uvalde Shaheen

Cain Klick Sheffield

Calanni Krause Sherman, Sr.

Canales Kuempel Shine

Capriglione Lambert Smith

Clardy Landgraf Smithee

Cole Lang Springer

Coleman Larson Stephenson

Collier Leach Stickland

Cortez Leman Stucky

Craddick Longoria Swanson

Cyrier Lozano Talarico

Darby Lucio III Thierry

Davis of Dallas Martinez Thompson of Brazoria

Davis of Harris Martinez Fischer Thompson of Harris

Dean Metcalf Tinderholt

Deshotel Meyer Toth

Dominguez Meza Turner of Dallas

Dutton Middleton Turner of Tarrant

Farrar Miller VanDeaver

Fierro Minjarez Vo

Flynn Moody Walle

Frank Morrison White

Frullo Muñoz, Jr. Wilson

Geren Murphy Wray

Gervin-Hawkins Murr Wu

Goldman Neave Zedler

González of Dallas Nevárez Zerwas

González of El Paso Noble Zwiener

Goodwin