Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HR769 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 03/15/2019

                    H.R. No. 769


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, A life made rich through meaningful service drew to
 a close with the passing of Estella Lane Trevino of Edinburg on
 April 30, 2018, at the age of 95; and
 WHEREAS, The daughter of Jack Lane Sr. and Estella P. Lane,
 the former Estella Lane was born in Red Gate on August 6, 1922, and
 grew up there with five siblings, Francisca, Samuel, Jack, Aminta,
 and Jovita; when she was only 18, she opened a beauty salon, which
 she operated for 21 years; she married the love of her life, Jose
 Luis Trevino, and they were blessed with a daughter, Chiqui;
 devoted to her family, she joyfully welcomed the addition of a
 son-in-law, George X. Guerra, and she became "Bobi" to three
 grandchildren, Brian, Leanne, and Steven, and four
 great-grandchildren, Xavier, Oslo, Sean, and Cooper; and
 WHEREAS, Mrs. Trevino was elected in 1959 as the first female
 justice of the peace in Hidalgo County; after her four-year tenure,
 she worked as a night auditor at the Rodeway Inn in McAllen, and in
 1972, she was hired as executive director of the Edinburg Housing
 Authority, becoming the first woman to lead a Rio Grande Valley
 housing authority; over the course of more than four decades in that
 role, she distinguished herself through her skill and great
 dedication to ensuring that the most vulnerable members of society
 had safe, affordable housing; in 2005, she received the Hall of Fame
 Award for Outstanding Service from the Texas Chapter of the
 National Association of Housing and Redevelopment Officials; and
 WHEREAS, Always seeking to make a positive difference,
 Mrs. Trevino served on the board of the South Texas Independent
 School District, and she represented Rio Grande Valley seniors in
 the Texas Silver-Haired Legislature for many years; a valued member
 of St. Joseph Catholic Church, she was appointed as a trustee of El
 Rosario Charitable Trusts; she was named 2009 Woman of the Year by
 the Edinburg Chamber of Commerce, and the City of Edinburg declared
 September 23, 2011, as "Estella Lane Trevino Day"; in addition, The
 University of Texas-Pan American established an endowment in her
 name to provide scholarships for Edinburg students living in public
 housing; and
 WHEREAS, Deeply committed to her family, her faith, and her
 community, Estella Lane Trevino earned the lasting respect and
 admiration of all who were privileged to know her; now, therefore,
 be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 86th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the life of Estella Lane Trevino
 and extend sincere condolences to all who mourn her passing; and, be
 it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Estella
 Lane Trevino.
 Guerra
 Bonnen of Brazoria Guerra Noble Bonnen of Brazoria Guerra Noble
Bonnen of Brazoria Guerra Noble
 Allen Guillen Oliverson Allen Guillen Oliverson
Allen Guillen Oliverson
 Allison Gutierrez Ortega Allison Gutierrez Ortega
Allison Gutierrez Ortega
 Anchia Harless Pacheco Anchia Harless Pacheco
Anchia Harless Pacheco
 Anderson Harris Paddie Anderson Harris Paddie
Anderson Harris Paddie
 Ashby Hefner Parker Ashby Hefner Parker
Ashby Hefner Parker
 Bailes Hernandez Patterson Bailes Hernandez Patterson
Bailes Hernandez Patterson
 Beckley Herrero Paul Beckley Herrero Paul
Beckley Herrero Paul
 Bell of Kaufman Hinojosa Perez Bell of Kaufman Hinojosa Perez
Bell of Kaufman Hinojosa Perez
 Bell of Montgomery Holland Phelan Bell of Montgomery Holland Phelan
Bell of Montgomery Holland Phelan
 Bernal Howard Price Bernal Howard Price
Bernal Howard Price
 Biedermann Huberty Ramos Biedermann Huberty Ramos
Biedermann Huberty Ramos
 Blanco Hunter Raney Blanco Hunter Raney
Blanco Hunter Raney
 Bohac Israel Raymond Bohac Israel Raymond
Bohac Israel Raymond
 Bonnen of Galveston E. Johnson of Dallas Reynolds Bonnen of Galveston E. Johnson of Dallas Reynolds
Bonnen of Galveston E. Johnson of Dallas Reynolds
 Bowers J. Johnson of Dallas Rodriguez Bowers J. Johnson of Dallas Rodriguez
Bowers J. Johnson of Dallas Rodriguez
 Buckley Johnson of Harris Romero, Jr. Buckley Johnson of Harris Romero, Jr.
Buckley Johnson of Harris Romero, Jr.
 Bucy Kacal Rose Bucy Kacal Rose
Bucy Kacal Rose
 Burns King of Hemphill Rosenthal Burns King of Hemphill Rosenthal
Burns King of Hemphill Rosenthal
 Burrows King of Parker Sanford Burrows King of Parker Sanford
Burrows King of Parker Sanford
 Button King of Uvalde Schaefer Button King of Uvalde Schaefer
Button King of Uvalde Schaefer
 Cain Klick Shaheen Cain Klick Shaheen
Cain Klick Shaheen
 Calanni Krause Sheffield Calanni Krause Sheffield
Calanni Krause Sheffield
 Canales Kuempel Sherman, Sr. Canales Kuempel Sherman, Sr.
Canales Kuempel Sherman, Sr.
 Capriglione Lambert Shine Capriglione Lambert Shine
Capriglione Lambert Shine
 Clardy Landgraf Smith Clardy Landgraf Smith
Clardy Landgraf Smith
 Cole Lang Smithee Cole Lang Smithee
Cole Lang Smithee
 Coleman Larson Springer Coleman Larson Springer
Coleman Larson Springer
 Collier Leach Stephenson Collier Leach Stephenson
Collier Leach Stephenson
 Cortez Leman Stickland Cortez Leman Stickland
Cortez Leman Stickland
 Craddick Longoria Stucky Craddick Longoria Stucky
Craddick Longoria Stucky
 Cyrier Lopez Swanson Cyrier Lopez Swanson
Cyrier Lopez Swanson
 Darby Lozano Talarico Darby Lozano Talarico
Darby Lozano Talarico
 Davis of Dallas Lucio III Thierry Davis of Dallas Lucio III Thierry
Davis of Dallas Lucio III Thierry
 Davis of Harris Martinez Thompson of Brazoria Davis of Harris Martinez Thompson of Brazoria
Davis of Harris Martinez Thompson of Brazoria
 Dean Martinez Fischer Thompson of Harris Dean Martinez Fischer Thompson of Harris
Dean Martinez Fischer Thompson of Harris
 Deshotel Metcalf Tinderholt Deshotel Metcalf Tinderholt
Deshotel Metcalf Tinderholt
 Dominguez Meyer Toth Dominguez Meyer Toth
Dominguez Meyer Toth
 Dutton Meza Turner of Dallas Dutton Meza Turner of Dallas
Dutton Meza Turner of Dallas
 Farrar Middleton Turner of Tarrant Farrar Middleton Turner of Tarrant
Farrar Middleton Turner of Tarrant
 Fierro Miller VanDeaver Fierro Miller VanDeaver
Fierro Miller VanDeaver
 Flynn Minjarez Vo Flynn Minjarez Vo
Flynn Minjarez Vo
 Frank Moody Walle Frank Moody Walle
Frank Moody Walle
 Frullo Morales White Frullo Morales White
Frullo Morales White
 Geren Morrison Wilson Geren Morrison Wilson
Geren Morrison Wilson
 Gervin-Hawkins Muñoz, Jr. Wray Gervin-Hawkins Muñoz, Jr. Wray
Gervin-Hawkins Muñoz, Jr. Wray
 Goldman Murphy Wu Goldman Murphy Wu
Goldman Murphy Wu
 González of Dallas Murr Zedler González of Dallas Murr Zedler
González of Dallas Murr Zedler
 González of El Paso Neave Zerwas González of El Paso Neave Zerwas
González of El Paso Neave Zerwas
 Goodwin Nevárez Zwiener Goodwin Nevárez Zwiener
Goodwin Nevárez Zwiener
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 769 was unanimously adopted by a rising
 vote of the House on March 13, 2019.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House



Bonnen of Brazoria Guerra Noble

Allen Guillen Oliverson

Allison Gutierrez Ortega

Anchia Harless Pacheco

Anderson Harris Paddie

Ashby Hefner Parker

Bailes Hernandez Patterson

Beckley Herrero Paul

Bell of Kaufman Hinojosa Perez

Bell of Montgomery Holland Phelan

Bernal Howard Price

Biedermann Huberty Ramos

Blanco Hunter Raney

Bohac Israel Raymond

Bonnen of Galveston E. Johnson of Dallas Reynolds

Bowers J. Johnson of Dallas Rodriguez

Buckley Johnson of Harris Romero, Jr.

Bucy Kacal Rose

Burns King of Hemphill Rosenthal

Burrows King of Parker Sanford

Button King of Uvalde Schaefer

Cain Klick Shaheen

Calanni Krause Sheffield

Canales Kuempel Sherman, Sr.

Capriglione Lambert Shine

Clardy Landgraf Smith

Cole Lang Smithee

Coleman Larson Springer

Collier Leach Stephenson

Cortez Leman Stickland

Craddick Longoria Stucky

Cyrier Lopez Swanson

Darby Lozano Talarico

Davis of Dallas Lucio III Thierry

Davis of Harris Martinez Thompson of Brazoria

Dean Martinez Fischer Thompson of Harris

Deshotel Metcalf Tinderholt

Dominguez Meyer Toth

Dutton Meza Turner of Dallas

Farrar Middleton Turner of Tarrant

Fierro Miller VanDeaver

Flynn Minjarez Vo

Frank Moody Walle

Frullo Morales White

Geren Morrison Wilson

Gervin-Hawkins Muñoz, Jr. Wray

Goldman Murphy Wu

González of Dallas Murr Zedler

González of El Paso Neave Zerwas

Goodwin Nevárez Zwiener