Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1045 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/29/2019

                    By: Hughes S.B. No. 1045
 (In the Senate - Filed February 22, 2019; March 7, 2019,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Education;
 April 29, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 10, Nays 0; April 29, 2019,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1045 By:  Hughes


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to academic accountability ratings for certain school
 districts, open-enrollment charter schools, and contracted
 entities that offer full-time online programs through the state
 virtual school network.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 30A, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Sections 30A.1011, 30A.1012, and 30A.1013 to read
 as follows:
 Sec. 30A.1011.  AUTHORITY TO OPERATE FULL-TIME ONLINE
 PROGRAM.  (a)  A school district or open-enrollment charter school
 may not operate more than one full-time online program under this
 chapter.
 (b)  The provisions of this section may not be waived by the
 commissioner.
 Sec. 30A.1012.  CONTRACTING FOR FULL-TIME ONLINE PROGRAM.
 (a)  A school district or open-enrollment charter school that
 contracts with an entity to operate a full-time online program for
 the district or school shall report to the agency:
 (1)  the identity of the contracted entity each year
 the contracted entity operates the full-time online program; and
 (2)  information required to be reported under Section
 42.006 regarding staff and finances as if the full-time online
 program were a campus.
 (b)  A school district or open-enrollment charter school
 shall revoke a contract with an entity to operate a full-time online
 program for the district or school if the entity has received for
 the three most recent school years a campus or district
 accountability rating of D or F under Subchapter C, Chapter 39. A
 school district or open-enrollment charter school shall include a
 contract revocation provision in each contract entered into with an
 entity to operate a full-time online program for the district or
 school under this section.
 (c)  The agency shall notify a school district or
 open-enrollment charter school that the district or school is
 subject to Subsection (b) if its full-time online program has
 received for the three most recent school years accountability
 ratings described by Subsection (b). Failure to receive notice
 under this subsection does not affect the requirement imposed on
 the district or school under Subsection (b).
 (d)  A school district or open-enrollment charter school may
 not contract with an entity to operate a full-time online program
 for the district or school if the contracted entity operated a
 full-time online program for a district or school and the
 contracting entity was subject to a contract revocation under
 Subsection (b) within the preceding 10 years.
 (e)  The administering authority shall include a list of
 entities subject to a contract revocation under Subsection (b) on
 the state virtual school network Internet website.
 (f)  An entity under this section includes a corporate
 affiliate or an entity that is substantially related to the entity.
 (g)  The provisions of this section may not be waived by the
 commissioner.
 Sec. 30A.1013.  REVOCATION OF APPROVAL FOR FULL-TIME ONLINE
 PROGRAM. If the commissioner revokes approval for a school
 district or open-enrollment charter school to operate a full-time
 online program under this chapter, the district or school may not
 operate a full-time online program under this chapter during the
 10-year period following the revocation.
 SECTION 2.  Section 30A.110, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (d), (d-1), and (d-2) to read as follows:
 (d)  An entity that operates a full-time online program shall
 receive an accountability rating under Chapter 39.  An entity that
 operates multiple full-time online programs shall receive an
 accountability rating for:
 (1)  each full-time online program as if the program
 were a campus; and
 (2)  the entity as if the entity were a school district
 or open-enrollment charter school and each full-time online program
 were a campus of the district or school.
 (d-1)  This subsection applies only to a school district or
 open-enrollment charter school that provides instruction to
 students while students are located on the physical premises of a
 district or school campus and provides separate instruction to
 students enrolled full-time in courses provided through a district
 or school full-time online program. In determining the performance
 ratings under Section 39.054 of a school district or
 open-enrollment charter school subject to this subsection, the
 commissioner shall evaluate the performance of students enrolled in
 a district or school full-time online program separately from the
 performance of other district or school students and assign:
 (1)  separate district or school overall and domain
 performance ratings for the district's or school's full-time online
 program if the district or school operates multiple full-time
 online programs; and
 (2)  separate campus overall and domain performance
 ratings for each full-time online program.
 (d-2)  Subsection (d-1) and this subsection expire September
 1, 2021.
 SECTION 3.  Sections 30A.110(d-1) and (d-2), Education Code,
 as added by this Act, apply beginning with the 2019-2020 school
 year.
 SECTION 4.  Sections 30A.1011, 30A.1012, 30A.1013, and
 30A.110(d), Education Code, as added by this Act, apply beginning
 with the 2020-2021 school year.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *