By: Fallon S.B. No. 1048 (In the Senate - Filed February 22, 2019; March 7, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Property Tax; April 1, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; April 1, 2019, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to an independent school district holding elections on the November uniform election date. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 11.0581(a), Education Code, is amended to read as follows: (a) An election for trustees of an independent school district shall be held on the November uniform election date [the same date as: [(1) the election for the members of the governing body of a municipality located in the school district; [(2) the general election for state and county officers; [(3) the election for the members of the governing body of a hospital district, if the school district: [(A) is wholly or partly located in a county with a population of less than 40,000 that is adjacent to a county with a population of more than three million; and [(B) held its election for trustees jointly with the election for the members of the governing body of the hospital district before May 2007; or [(4) the election for the members of the governing board of a public junior college district in which the school district is wholly or partly located]. SECTION 2. Section 41.012, Education Code, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 41.012. DATE OF ELECTIONS. An election under this chapter for voter approval of an agreement entered by the board of trustees shall be held on the November uniform election date [a Tuesday or Saturday not more than 45 days after the date of the agreement. Section 41.001, Election Code, does not apply to the election]. SECTION 3. Section 41.253(b), Education Code, is amended to read as follows: (b) The transitional board of trustees shall divide the consolidated district into nine single-member trustee districts in accordance with the procedures provided by Section 11.052. The transitional board shall order an election for the initial board of trustees to be held on the first November [May] uniform election date after the effective date of a consolidation order. SECTION 4. Subchapter A, Chapter 41, Election Code, is amended by adding Section 41.0051 to read as follows: Sec. 41.0051. INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT ELECTION TO ISSUE BONDS. Notwithstanding any other law, an election for the issuance of bonds by an independent school district shall be held on the November uniform election date. SECTION 5. Section 41.0052, Election Code, is amended by adding Subsection (a-3) to read as follows: (a-3) The governing body of an independent school district that holds its general election for officers on a date other than the November uniform election date shall, not later than December 31, 2019, change the date on which it holds its general election for officers to the November uniform election date. This subsection expires January 1, 2020. SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. * * * * *