Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1083 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/15/2019

                    By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 1083
 (In the Senate - Filed February 25, 2019; March 7, 2019,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; April 15, 2019, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; April 15, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to compensation to be paid to an emergency services
 district for a municipality's annexation of the district's
 territory.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 775.022, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by amending Subsections (c) and (e) and adding Subsection
 (e-1) to read as follows:
 (c)  If a municipality removes territory from a district that
 the municipality has annexed, the municipality shall compensate the
 district immediately after disannexation of the territory under
 Subsection (a) in an amount equal to the annexed territory's pro
 rata share of the district's bonded and other indebtedness as
 computed according to the formula in Subsection (e) or (e-1),
 whichever yields the greater amount. The district shall apply
 compensation received from a municipality under this subsection
 exclusively to the payment of the annexed territory's pro rata
 share of the district's bonded and other indebtedness.
 (e)  Unless Subsection (e-1) would yield a greater amount,
 the [The] amount of compensation under Subsection (c) shall be
 determined by multiplying the district's total indebtedness at the
 time of the annexation by a fraction the numerator of which is the
 assessed value of the property to be annexed based on the most
 recent certified county property tax rolls at the time of
 annexation and the denominator of which is the total assessed value
 of the property of the district based on the most recent certified
 county property tax rolls at the time of annexation.
 (e-1)  Unless Subsection (e) would yield a greater amount,
 the amount of compensation under Subsection (c) shall be determined
 by multiplying the district's total indebtedness at the time of the
 annexation by a fraction:
 (1)  the numerator of which is the assessed value of the
 property to be annexed based on the most recent certified county
 property tax rolls at the time of annexation plus the total amount
 of the district's sales and use tax revenue collected by retailers
 located in the property to be annexed in the 12 months preceding the
 date of annexation, as reported by the comptroller; and
 (2)  the denominator of which is the total assessed
 value of the property of the district based on the most recent
 certified county property tax rolls at the time of annexation plus
 the total amount of the district's sales and use tax revenue
 collected by retailers located in the district in the 12 months
 preceding the date of annexation, as reported by the comptroller.
 SECTION 2.  Section 8437.002(d), Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (d)  Sections 775.022(b), (c), (d), (e), (e-1), and (f),
 Health and Safety Code, apply to a disannexation under this
 section, as if the disannexation occurred under the provisions of
 Section 775.022(a), Health and Safety Code.
 SECTION 3.  Section 9036.002(d), Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (d)  Sections 775.022(b), (c), (d), (e), (e-1), and (f),
 Health and Safety Code, apply to a disannexation under this
 section, as if the disannexation occurred under the provisions of
 Section 775.022(a), Health and Safety Code.
 SECTION 4.  Section 9042.002(d), Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (d)  Sections 775.022(b), (c), (d), (e), (e-1), and (f),
 Health and Safety Code, apply to a disannexation under this
 section, as if the disannexation occurred under the provisions of
 Section 775.022(a), Health and Safety Code.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *