Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1090 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/06/2019

                    By: Campbell S.B. No. 1090
 (In the Senate - Filed February 25, 2019; March 7, 2019,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Property Tax;
 May 6, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 6, 2019, sent
 to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1090 By:  Paxton


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the vote required to authorize the issuance of certain
 bonds.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Chapter 2, Election Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 2.  VOTE REQUIRED FOR ELECTION [TO OFFICE]
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 2, Election Code, is amended by adding
 Subchapter E to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER E. SUPERMAJORITY REQUIREMENT FOR CERTAIN ELECTIONS
 Sec. 2.101.  POLITICAL SUBDIVISION BOND ELECTION.
 Notwithstanding any other law, an election held by a political
 subdivision to authorize the issuance of bonds does not authorize
 the issuance of the bonds unless at least three-fifths of the voters
 voting in the election vote in favor of authorizing the issuance of
 bonds.
 SECTION 3.  This Act applies only to an election ordered on
 or after the effective date of this Act.  An election ordered before
 the effective date of this Act is governed by the law as it existed
 immediately before the effective date of this Act, and that law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *