Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1093 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/25/2019

                    86R5769 KKR-D
 By: Perry S.B. No. 1093


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the eligibility of children and prioritization of
 persons on waiting lists for certain Medicaid long-term care
 services waiver programs.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 531, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Sections 531.0601 and 531.0602 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 531.0601.  LONG-TERM CARE SERVICES WAIVER PROGRAM
 INTEREST LISTS.  (a)  This section applies only to a child who
 becomes ineligible for services under the medically dependent
 children (MDCP) waiver program because the child no longer meets:
 (1)  the level of care criteria for medical necessity
 for nursing facility care; or
 (2)  the age requirement for the program.
 (b)  A legally authorized representative of a child who is
 notified by the commission that the child is no longer eligible for
 the medically dependent children (MDCP) waiver program may request
 that the commission:
 (1)  return the child to the interest list for the
 program unless the child is ineligible due to the child's age; or
 (2)  place the child on the interest list for another
 Section 1915(c) waiver program.
 (c)  At the time a child's legally authorized representative
 makes a request under Subsection (b), the commission shall:
 (1)  for a child who becomes ineligible for the reason
 described by Subsection (a)(1), place the child:
 (A)  on the interest list for the medically
 dependent children (MDCP) waiver program in the first position on
 the list; or
 (B)  except as provided by Subdivision (3), on the
 interest list for another Section 1915(c) waiver program in a
 position relative to other persons on the list that is based on the
 date the child was initially placed on the interest list for the
 medically dependent children (MDCP) waiver program;
 (2)  except as provided by Subdivision (3), for a child
 who becomes ineligible for the reason described by Subsection
 (a)(2), place the child on the interest list for another Section
 1915(c) waiver program in a position relative to other persons on
 the list that is based on the date the child was initially placed on
 the interest list for the medically dependent children (MDCP)
 waiver program; or
 (3)  for a child who becomes ineligible for a reason
 described by Subsection (a) and who is already on an interest list
 for another Section 1915(c) waiver program, move the child to a
 position on the interest list relative to other persons on the list
 that is based on the date the child was initially placed on the
 interest list for the medically dependent children (MDCP) waiver
 program, if that date is earlier than the date the child was
 initially placed on the interest list for the other waiver program.
 (d)  At the time the commission provides notice to a legally
 authorized representative that a child is no longer eligible for
 the medically dependent children (MDCP) waiver program, the
 commission shall inform the representative in writing about the
 options under this section for placing the child on an interest
 list.
 Sec. 531.0602.  MEDICALLY DEPENDENT CHILDREN (MDCP) WAIVER
 PROGRAM REASSESSMENTS.  (a)  To the extent allowed by federal law,
 the commission shall require that a child participating in the
 medically dependent children (MDCP) waiver program be reassessed to
 determine whether the child meets the level of care criteria for
 medical necessity for nursing facility care only if the child has a
 significant change in function that may affect the medical
 necessity for that level of care instead of requiring that the
 reassessment be made annually.
 (b)  If federal law requires that a reassessment of a child
 participating in the medically dependent children (MDCP) waiver
 program to determine whether the child meets the level of care
 criteria for medical necessity for nursing facility care be made
 annually, the commission shall allow the reassessment to be made on
 an expedited basis.
 SECTION 2.  As soon as possible after the effective date of
 this Act, the Health and Human Services Commission shall identify
 each child who became ineligible for services under the medically
 dependent children (MDCP) waiver program on or after July 1, 2016,
 and before January 1, 2019, based on the child's level of care
 assessment.  The commission shall, on request of the parent or
 legally authorized representative of an identified child, reassess
 the child to determine whether the child meets the level of care
 criteria for medical necessity for nursing facility care required
 to participate in the medically dependent children (MDCP) waiver
 program.
 SECTION 3.  Not later than December 1, 2019, the executive
 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall
 adopt rules necessary to implement Sections 531.0601 and 531.0602,
 Government Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 4.  Section 531.0601, Government Code, as added by
 this Act, applies only to a child who becomes ineligible for the
 medically dependent children (MDCP) waiver program on or after
 December 1, 2019.
 SECTION 5.  Section 531.0602, Government Code, as added by
 this Act, applies only to a reassessment of a child's eligibility
 for the medically dependent children (MDCP) waiver program made on
 or after December 1, 2019.
 SECTION 6.  If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 7.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.