Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1138 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/16/2019

                    By: Watson S.B. No. 1138
 (In the Senate - Filed February 26, 2019; March 7, 2019,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 April 16, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 13, Nays 0; April 16, 2019,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1138 By:  Watson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to security instruments entered into by the Texas Treasury
 Safekeeping Trust Company.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 404.103(b), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (b)  The trust company may enter into contracts, trust
 agreements, or other fiduciary instruments with the comptroller,
 the Federal Reserve System, a depository trust company, and other
 third parties.  The trust company shall be liable under those
 contracts in accordance with the terms contained in the contracts.
 Notwithstanding any other statute to the contrary, to the extent
 permitted by the Texas Constitution and the contracts, trust
 agreements, or other fiduciary instruments between the trust
 company, the Federal Reserve System, and a depository trust
 company, the trust company's obligations shall be guaranteed by the
 state, and the state expressly waives all defenses of governmental
 immunity by and on behalf of the trust company, the comptroller, and
 the state, and expressly consents to sue and be sued in federal
 court or in any court of competent jurisdiction.  Notwithstanding
 any other statute to the contrary, to the extent permitted by the
 Texas Constitution and the securities instruments between the trust
 company and third parties, the trust company's obligations shall be
 guaranteed only by the reserve balances held by the trust company
 under Section 404.105, and the state expressly waives all defenses
 of governmental immunity by and on behalf of the trust company, and
 the state expressly consents by and on behalf of the trust company
 to sue and be sued in federal court or in any court of competent
 jurisdiction.  However, this provision does not alter or affect the
 immunity accorded to state officials and employees under state law.
 The trust company may enter into contracts with the comptroller and
 the Federal Reserve System to provide any services that the Federal
 Reserve System makes available, including:
 (1)  safekeeping book-entry United States Treasury and
 agency securities owned by the state and its agencies;
 (2)  using the federal reserve wire transfer system to
 transfer money and book-entry securities and to settle securities
 transactions involving book-entry United States Treasury and
 agency securities owned by the state and its agencies;
 (3)  collecting, through the Federal Reserve System,
 checks deposited with the treasury;
 (4)  receiving payments from and making payments to the
 federal government on behalf of the state and its agencies;
 (5)  originating automated clearinghouse transactions
 or other electronic transfers to make payments on behalf of the
 state and its agencies, collecting revenues due the state and its
 agencies, and transferring money between state depositories;
 (6)  paying warrants drawn on the treasury and
 presented through the Federal Reserve System for payment; and
 (7)  safekeeping collateral pledged to secure deposits
 of public funds.
 SECTION 2.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a security instrument entered into on or after the effective date of
 this Act.  A security instrument entered into before the effective
 date of this Act is subject to the law in effect on the date that the
 security was entered into, and that law is continued in effect for
 that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *