Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1140 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/11/2019

                    By: Watson S.B. No. 1140
 (In the Senate - Filed February 26, 2019; March 7, 2019,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human
 Services; April 11, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 April 11, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1140 By:  Perry


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an independent medical review of certain determinations
 by the Health and Human Services Commission or a Medicaid managed
 care organization.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 533, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 533.00715 to read as follows:
 Sec. 533.00715.  INDEPENDENT APPEALS PROCEDURE. (a)  In
 this section, "third-party arbiter" means a third-party medical
 review organization that provides objective, unbiased medical
 necessity determinations conducted by clinical staff with
 education and practice in the same or similar practice area as the
 procedure for which an independent determination of medical
 necessity is sought.
 (b)  The commission, using money appropriated for the
 purpose, shall contract with at least three independent,
 third-party arbiters to resolve recipient appeals of any commission
 or a Medicaid managed care organization adverse benefit
 determination or reduction in or denial of health care services on
 the basis of medical necessity.
 (c)  The commission shall establish a common procedure for
 appeals. The procedure must provide that a health care service
 ordered by a health care provider is presumed medically necessary
 and the commission or Medicaid managed care organization bears the
 burden of proof to show the health care service is not medically
 necessary. The commission shall also establish a procedure for
 expedited appeals that allows a third-party arbiter to:
 (1)  identify an appeal that requires an expedited
 resolution; and
 (2)  resolve the appeal within a specified period.
 (d)  Subject to Subsection (e), the commission shall ensure
 an appeal is randomly assigned to a third-party arbiter.
 (e)  The commission shall ensure each third-party arbiter
 has the necessary medical expertise to resolve an appeal.
 (f)  A third-party arbiter shall establish and maintain an
 Internet portal through which a recipient may track the status and
 final disposition of an appeal.
 (g)  A third-party arbiter shall educate recipients
 regarding:
 (1)  appeals processes and options;
 (2)  proper and improper denials of health care
 services on the basis of medical necessity; and
 (3)  information available through the commission's
 office of the ombudsman.
 (h)  A third-party arbiter may share with Medicaid managed
 care organizations information regarding:
 (1)  appeals processes; and
 (2)  the types of documents the arbiter may require
 from the organization to resolve appeals.
 (i)  A third-party arbiter shall notify the commission of the
 final disposition of each appeal.  The commission shall review
 aggregate denial data categorized by Medicaid managed care plan to
 identify trends and determine whether a Medicaid managed care
 organization is disproportionately denying prior authorization
 requests from a single provider or set of providers.
 SECTION 2.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the executive commissioner of the Health and Human
 Services Commission shall adopt the rules necessary to implement
 this Act.
 SECTION 3.  If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *