Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1182 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/30/2019

                    By: Campbell S.B. No. 1182
 (In the Senate - Filed February 26, 2019; March 7, 2019,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Education;
 April 30, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 1, 1 present not
 voting; April 30, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1182 By:  Campbell


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to review and approval by the attorney general of certain
 bonds financing an educational facility for certain charter
 schools.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 53.40, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  The attorney general has sole authority to review the
 record of public notice and hearings relating to any bond financing
 an educational facility for an authorized charter school, and the
 attorney general may issue an approval as required by Section
 147(f), Internal Revenue Code of 1986.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *