Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1209 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/08/2019

                    By: Hancock, Hall S.B. No. 1209
 (In the Senate - Filed February 27, 2019; March 7, 2019,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 8, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 8, 2019,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1209 By:  Nelson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of a political subdivision to regulate
 certain activities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Title 2, Occupations Code, is amended by adding
 Chapter 60 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 60. PREEMPTION
 Sec. 60.001.  PREEMPTION OF LOCAL LICENSING REQUIREMENTS.
 (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Occupational license" means a license, permit,
 registration, certificate, or other authorization that is:
 (A)  issued by a licensing authority; and
 (B)  required by an ordinance, rule, regulation,
 policy, or law for an individual to engage in an occupation.
 (2)  "Political subdivision" means a county,
 municipality, special district, or other political subdivision of
 this state.
 (3)  "State licensing authority" means a state agency,
 department, board, or commission or the executive or administrative
 officer of a state agency, department, board, or commission that
 issues an occupational license.
 (b)  Notwithstanding any other law, other than Subsection
 (d), if an individual is required to possess an occupational
 license issued by a state licensing authority to engage in an
 occupation, a political subdivision may not adopt or enforce any
 ordinance, order, rule, regulation, law, or policy that requires
 the individual to:
 (1)  possess an occupational license issued by the
 political subdivision to engage in that occupation; or
 (2)  meet any other requirement or precondition to
 engage in that occupation.
 (c)  An ordinance, order, rule, regulation, law, or policy
 that violates Subsection (b) is void and unenforceable.
 (d)  This section does not limit the authority of a political
 subdivision to adopt and enforce:
 (1)  a zoning regulation, including a zoning regulation
 or zoning district boundary adopted under Chapter 211 or 231, Local
 Government Code;
 (2)  a restriction on the location where an occupation
 may be engaged in, including a restriction on the location of a
 sexually oriented business or a business licensed or permitted
 under the Alcoholic Beverage Code to sell an alcoholic beverage; or
 (3)  an ordinance, order, rule, regulation, law, or
 policy that regulates a credit access business, as defined by
 Section 393.601, Finance Code.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *