Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1235 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/23/2019

                    By: Buckingham S.B. No. 1235
 (In the Senate - Filed February 27, 2019; March 7, 2019,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human
 Services; April 23, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 April 23, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1235 By:  Perry


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the enrollment of health care providers in Medicaid.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 531.02118, Government Code, is amended
 by amending Subsection (c) and adding Subsections (e), (f), (g),
 (h), and (i) to read as follows:
 (c)  In streamlining the Medicaid provider credentialing
 process under this section, the commission may designate a
 centralized credentialing entity and shall require [may]:
 (1)  that the credentialing entity and the entity
 serving as the state's Medicaid claims administrator share
 information to reduce the submission of duplicative information or
 documents necessary for both Medicaid enrollment and credentialing
 [in the database established under Subchapter C, Chapter 32, Human
 Resources Code, with the centralized credentialing entity]; and
 (2)  [require] all managed care organizations
 contracting with the commission to provide health care services to
 Medicaid recipients under a managed care plan issued by the
 organization to use the centralized credentialing entity as a hub
 for the collection and sharing of information.
 (e)  Subject to Subsection (f), the commission shall enroll a
 provider as a Medicaid provider, without requiring the provider to
 separately apply for enrollment through the entity serving as the
 state's Medicaid claims administrator, if the provider is:
 (1)  credentialed by a managed care organization that
 contracts with the commission under Chapter 533; or
 (2)  enrolled as a Medicare provider.
 (f)  The executive commissioner by rule may establish
 additional enrollment requirements that are:
 (1)  necessary to enroll a provider as a Medicaid
 provider; and
 (2)  not otherwise required by managed care
 organization credentialing or Medicare provider enrollment.
 (g)  The commission shall track the number of providers that
 enroll as Medicaid providers through each type of enrollment
 process described by Subsection (e), including the enrollment
 process through the entity serving as the state's Medicaid claims
 administrator.
 (h)  The commission shall develop a process to streamline the
 Medicaid enrollment of a provider who:
 (1)  provides services through a single case agreement
 to a recipient who is also enrolled in a private group health
 benefit plan; and
 (2)  is enrolled as a provider in that group health
 benefit plan.
 (i)  The commission shall use a provider's national provider
 identifier number to enroll a provider under Subsection (h). In
 this subsection, "national provider identifier number" means the
 national provider identifier number required under Section
 1128J(e), Social Security Act (42 U.S.C. Section 1320a-7k(e)).
 SECTION 2.  If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 3.  The Health and Human Services Commission is
 required to implement a provision of this Act only if the
 legislature appropriates money specifically for that purpose.  If
 the legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that
 purpose, the commission may, but is not required to, implement a
 provision of this Act using other appropriations available for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *