Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1238 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/01/2019

                    By: Johnson S.B. No. 1238
 (In the Senate - Filed February 27, 2019; March 7, 2019,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human
 Services; April 1, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 April 1, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1238 By:  Johnson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the admission, examination, and discharge of a person
 for voluntary mental health services.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 572.0025, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by amending Subsections (f) and (g) and adding Subsections
 (f-1), (f-2), and (f-3) to read as follows:
 (f)  A prospective voluntary patient may not be formally
 accepted for treatment in a facility unless:
 (1)  the facility has a physician's order admitting the
 prospective patient, which order may be issued orally,
 electronically, or in writing, signed by the physician, provided
 that, in the case of an oral order or an electronically transmitted
 unsigned order, a signed original is presented to the mental health
 facility within 24 hours of the initial order; the order must be
 from:
 (A)  an admitting physician who has, either in
 person or through the use of audiovisual or other
 telecommunications technology, conducted a physical and
 psychiatric examination within:
 (i)  72 hours before [of the] admission; or
 (ii)  24 hours after admission; or
 (B)  an admitting physician who has consulted with
 a physician who has, either in person or through the use of
 audiovisual or other telecommunications technology, conducted an
 examination within:
 (i)  72 hours before [of the] admission; or
 (ii)  24 hours after admission; and
 (2)  the facility administrator or a person designated
 by the administrator has agreed to accept the prospective patient
 and has signed a statement to that effect.
 (f-1)  A person who is admitted to a facility before the
 performance of the physical and psychiatric examination required by
 Subsection (f) must be discharged by the physician immediately if
 the physician conducting the physical and psychiatric examination
 determines the person does not meet the clinical standards to
 receive inpatient mental health services.
 (f-2)  A facility that discharges a patient under the
 circumstances described by Subsection (f-1) may not bill the
 patient or the patient's third-party payor for the temporary
 admission of the patient to the inpatient mental health facility.
 (f-3)  Sections 572.001(c) and (c-2) apply to the admission
 of a minor in the managing conservatorship of the Department of
 Family and Protective Services to an inpatient mental health
 facility.
 (g)  An assessment conducted as required by rules adopted
 under this section does not satisfy a statutory or regulatory
 requirement for a personal evaluation of a patient or a prospective
 patient by a physician [before admission].
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *