Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1239 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/11/2019

                    By: Johnson S.B. No. 1239
 (In the Senate - Filed February 27, 2019; March 7, 2019,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human
 Services; April 11, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 April 11, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1239 By:  Johnson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to continuing education requirements for surgical
 technologists.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Section 259.002, Health and
 Safety Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 259.002.  REQUIREMENTS FOR PRACTICING SURGICAL
 TECHNOLOGY; CONTINUING EDUCATION.
 SECTION 2.  Section 259.002, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsections (d), (e), and (f) to read as follows:
 (d)  A person employed by a health care facility to practice
 surgical technology under Subsection (a)(1) shall complete the
 number of hours of continuing education required to maintain
 certification by the organization that issued the surgical
 technologist certification to the person.  On the facility's
 request, the person shall submit to the facility evidence of
 completion of the continuing education.
 (e)  A person employed by a health care facility to practice
 surgical technology under Subsection (a)(2) or (3) or Subsection
 (c) shall complete every two years 30 hours of continuing education
 related to surgical technology.  On the facility's request, the
 person shall submit to the facility evidence of completion of the
 continuing education.
 (f)  A health care facility may restrict the ability of a
 person employed by the facility to practice surgical technology in
 the facility if the person fails to complete the continuing
 education required by Subsection (d) or (e).
 SECTION 3.  Notwithstanding Sections 259.002(d) and (e),
 Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act, a person employed by a
 health care facility to practice surgical technology is not
 required to complete the continuing education before September 1,
 2020.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *