Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1255 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/08/2019

                    By: Bettencourt S.B. No. 1255
 (In the Senate - Filed February 27, 2019; March 7, 2019,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 8, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 8, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the location of countywide polling places within a
 county.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 43.007(m), Election Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (m)  In adopting a methodology under Subsection (f), the
 county must ensure that:
 (1)  each county commissioners precinct contains at
 least one countywide polling place and the percentage of the total
 number of countywide polling places located in each commissioners
 precinct must be as equal as mathematically possible to the
 percentage of registered voters of the county whose registrations
 are effective on the date of the election residing in each
 commissioners precinct; and
 (2)  in a county with a population of 400,000 or more,
 the percentage of the total number of countywide polling places
 located in each state representative district in the county
 containing territory in which the election is held must be as equal
 as mathematically possible to the percentage of registered voters
 of the county whose registrations are effective on the date of the
 election residing in each state representative district [the total
 number of permanent branch and temporary branch polling places open
 for voting in a county commissioners precinct does not exceed more
 than twice the number of permanent branch and temporary branch
 polling places in another county commissioners precinct].
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *