Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1268 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/23/2019

                    By: Watson S.B. No. 1268
 (In the Senate - Filed February 28, 2019; March 7, 2019,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 April 23, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 6,
 Nays 0; April 23, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a statement presented in a criminal case by a victim,
 close relative of a deceased victim, or guardian of a victim.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1, Article 42.03, Code of Criminal
 Procedure, is amended by adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  The court may not impose a limit on the number of
 victims, close relatives, or guardians who may appear and present
 statements under Subsection (b) unless the court finds that
 additional statements would unreasonably delay the proceeding.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies to a
 defendant who is sentenced for an offense on or after the effective
 date of this Act, regardless of whether the offense is committed
 before, on, or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *