Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1284 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/30/2019

                    By: Miles S.B. No. 1284
 (In the Senate - Filed February 28, 2019; March 7, 2019,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Education;
 April 30, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 2; April 30, 2019,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1284 By:  Powell


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a competitive grant program to fund promotion of early
 literacy programs in certain communities in this state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 73, Education Code, is amended by adding
 Subchapter J to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER J.  COMPETITIVE GRANT PROGRAM TO PROMOTE EARLY LITERACY
 Sec. 73.701.  DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter:
 (1)  "Competitive grant program" means the competitive
 grant program to promote early literacy established under this
 subchapter.
 (2)  "Health care practitioner" has the meaning
 assigned by Section 112.001, Occupations Code.
 (3)  "Health science center" means The University of
 Texas Health Science Center at Houston.
 (4)  "Literacy program" means a program to promote
 early literacy.
 Sec. 73.702.  ESTABLISHMENT OF COMPETITIVE GRANT PROGRAM TO
 PROMOTE EARLY LITERACY. (a)  Subject to Section 73.709, The
 University of Texas Health Science Center at Houston shall
 establish a competitive grant program to promote early literacy
 through which the health science center will award grants for the
 implementation of literacy programs, or the expansion of existing
 programs, and for the operation of those programs for a period of
 not less than two years.
 (b)  The health science center shall award grants under the
 program to applicants, including applicants operating existing
 programs, in a manner that ensures that the literacy programs
 collectively operate in multiple communities that are
 geographically distributed throughout this state.
 Sec. 73.703.  LITERACY PROGRAM REQUIREMENTS.  A literacy
 program funded through a grant awarded under this subchapter must:
 (1)  consult and use as a guide the program model
 developed by the Reach Out and Read National Center, including any
 clinical, programmatic, and data collection requirements of that
 model;
 (2)  require that health care practitioners who
 participate in the literacy program:
 (A)  in conjunction with performing well-child
 examinations, provide books to children and encourage parents to
 read to their children to develop preliteracy skills;
 (B)  maintain waiting rooms that encourage
 children to read; and
 (C)  provide services designed to increase the
 school readiness of children receiving program services; and
 (3)  partner with local adult literacy providers to
 encourage parent literacy in appropriate circumstances.
 Sec. 73.704.  APPLICATION. (a)  A public or private entity,
 including a county, municipality, or other political subdivision of
 this state, may apply for a grant under this subchapter.
 (b)  To apply for a grant, an applicant must submit a written
 application to the health science center on a form prescribed by the
 health science center in consultation with the Reach Out and Read
 National Center.
 Sec. 73.705.  LITERACY PROGRAM GUIDELINES. The health
 science center, with the assistance of the Reach Out and Read
 National Center, shall publish guidelines for the literacy programs
 funded under this subchapter.  The guidelines may follow the Reach
 Out and Read national program model standards and guidelines that
 have been tested and replicated in multiple communities.
 Sec. 73.706.  USE OF PROGRAM MONEY. (a)  In addition to
 awarding grants under this subchapter, the health science center
 may use program money to:
 (1)  administer the competitive grant program; and
 (2)  purchase or contract to purchase discounted books
 for use by grant recipients.
 (b)  A grant recipient may use grant money awarded under this
 subchapter only to cover costs related to implementing or expanding
 and operating a literacy program, including costs related to:
 (1)  administering the literacy program;
 (2)  training and managing health care practitioners
 who volunteer to participate in the literacy program; and
 (3)  purchasing or contracting to purchase discounted
 books for use in the literacy program.
 Sec. 73.707.  PROGRAM EVALUATION; BIENNIAL COMMITTEE
 REPORTS. (a)  The health science center, with the assistance of
 the Reach Out and Read National Center, shall prepare and submit a
 biennial report, not later than December 1 of each even-numbered
 year, to the senate committee on education, or its successor, and
 the house public education committee, or its successor, regarding
 the grants awarded during the preceding two state fiscal years.
 (b)  The report required under Subsection (a) must include:
 (1)  the number of health care practitioners who
 participate in the program;
 (2)  the number of children receiving literacy program
 services as a result of the program; and
 (3)  the amount of each grant awarded to a health care
 practitioner under the program.
 (c)  On request, each grant recipient shall timely collect
 and provide data and any other information required by the health
 science center to monitor and evaluate the program, including
 recipient participation in the program, and to prepare the report
 required by this section.
 Sec. 73.708.  COMPETITIVE GRANT PROGRAM FUNDING.  (a)  The
 health science center shall actively seek and apply for any
 available federal money to assist in financing the competitive
 grant program established under this subchapter.
 (b)  To assist in financing the competitive grant program,
 the health science center may:
 (1)  use appropriated money from the state government;
 and
 (2)  accept gifts, donations, grants of money, and
 in-kind contributions from the federal government, local
 governments, private corporations, or other persons, provided that
 the health science center implements the program in accordance with
 the contingency under Section 73.709.
 Sec. 73.709.  APPROPRIATION CONTINGENCY.  The health science
 center is required to implement a provision of this subchapter only
 if the legislature appropriates money specifically for that
 purpose.  If the legislature does not appropriate money
 specifically for that purpose, the health science center may, but
 is not required to, implement the provision using other money
 available to the health science center for that purpose.
 SECTION 2.  The University of Texas Health Science Center at
 Houston shall:
 (1)  as soon as practicable, apply for any available
 federal money to assist in financing the competitive grant program
 under Subchapter J, Chapter 73, Education Code, as added by this
 Act, as required by Section 73.708, Education Code, as added by this
 Act; and
 (2)  not later than December 1, 2022, submit a report to
 the senate committee on education, or its successor, and the house
 public education committee, or its successor, regarding the
 implementation and status of the competitive grant program under
 Subchapter J, Chapter 73, Education Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *