Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1323 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/16/2019

                    By: Taylor S.B. No. 1323
 (In the Senate - Filed February 28, 2019; March 7, 2019,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Education;
 April 16, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 10, Nays 1; April 16, 2019,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1323 By:  Taylor


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to requiring certain students awarded dual credit by a
 public institution of higher education to complete and submit a
 financial aid application for higher education costs.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter Z, Chapter 51, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 51.9681 to read as follows:
 Sec. 51.9681.  FINANCIAL AID APPLICATION REQUIRED FOR DUAL
 CREDIT STUDENTS. (a)  In this section, "institution of higher
 education" has the meaning assigned by Section 61.003.
 (b)  Each student who earns a cumulative total of 15 or more
 semester credit hours at an institution of higher education for
 dual credit coursework successfully completed by the student before
 the student's last semester or term in 12th grade must complete and
 submit a free application for federal student aid (FAFSA) or, if
 applicable, a Texas application for state financial aid (TASFA) not
 later than the later of:
 (1)  six months after the last day of the semester or
 term in which the student earns that cumulative total; or
 (2)  January 15 of the school year in which the student
 is enrolled in 12th grade.
 (c)  A student is not required to comply with Subsection (b)
 if:
 (1)  the student's parent or other person standing in
 parental relation submits a signed form indicating that the parent
 or other person authorizes the student to decline to complete and
 submit the financial aid application; or
 (2)  the student signs and submits the form described
 by Subdivision (1) on the student's own behalf if the student is 18
 years of age or older or the student's disabilities of minority have
 been removed for general purposes under Chapter 31, Family Code.
 (d)  Each institution of higher education shall ensure that
 each student to whom the institution awards the cumulative total of
 semester credit hours described by Subsection (b) completes and
 submits the financial aid application as required by that
 subsection or submits a signed form to the institution under
 Subsection (c).
 (e)  Each institution of higher education shall adopt a form
 to be used for purposes of Subsection (c).
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies beginning with the 2019-2020
 academic year.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *